EP3594758 - WATCH PROVIDED WITH A ROTATING BEZEL WITH SYSTEM FOR LOCKING THE BEZEL PROVIDED WITH AN INTEGRATED HELIUM VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tissot S.A. Chemin des Tourelles 17 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehrsam, Nicolas Ch. des Bourdons 4 2533 Evilard / CH | 02 /
Saunders, Laurie Rue Netton Bosson 17 1632 Riaz / CH | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
Ehrsam, Nicolas Ch. des Bourdons 4 2533 Evilard / CH | ||
02 /
Saunders, Laurie Rue Netton Bosson 17 CH-1632 Riaz / CH | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18182381.6 | 09.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594758 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/28 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
G04B19/286 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARMBANDUHR, DIE MIT EINEM DREHBAREN AUSSENRING MIT VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM DES AUSSENRINGS MIT EINEM INTEGRIERTEN HELIUMVENTIL AUSGESTATTET IST | [2020/03] | English: | WATCH PROVIDED WITH A ROTATING BEZEL WITH SYSTEM FOR LOCKING THE BEZEL PROVIDED WITH AN INTEGRATED HELIUM VALVE | [2020/03] | French: | MONTRE POURVUE D'UNE LUNETTE TOURNANTE AVEC SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE DE LA LUNETTE MUNI D'UNE SOUPAPE À HÉLIUM INTEGRÉE | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/03] | MONTRE POURVUE D'UNE LUNETTE TOURNANTE AVEC SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE DE LA LUNETTE MUNI D'UNE SOUPAPE A HELIUM INTEGREE | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH503307 (PIBOR SA [CH]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [I]JPS5061882U (.) [I] 1-8 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]CH673197G (MANUF DE BOITES DE MONTRES MRP [CH]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [I]US2008117723 (HIRANUMA HARUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * figures 3A,3B * |