EP3427665 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ONLINE CALIBRATION OF A MEDICAL X-RAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/03] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ONLINE CALIBRATION OF A MEDICAL DEVICE WITH X-RAYS | ||
[2024/32] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES TOUR CARPE DIEM Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORGES, Sébastien 8 chemin du Moulin 38430 Saint Jean de Moirans / FR | 02 /
BERNARD, Guillaume 12 rue Séraphin Martin 38430 Moirans / FR | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2024/41] |
Former [2019/03] | Dudouit, Isabelle, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18182657.9 | 10.07.2018 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | FR20170000740 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: FR 1700740 | [2019/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427665 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3427665 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B6/58 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
A61B6/5258 (EP,US);
A61B6/581 (US);
A61B6/4405 (US);
A61B6/4441 (EP,US);
A61B6/547 (EP,US);
A61B6/582 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ONLINE-KALIBRIERUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN RÖNTGENGERÄTEN | [2024/32] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ONLINE CALIBRATION OF A MEDICAL X-RAY DEVICE | [2024/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CALIBRATION EN LIGNE D'UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL A RAYONS X | [2019/03] |
Former [2019/03] | ONLINE-KALIBRIERVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM EINES MEDIZINISCHEN GERÄTS MIT RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN | ||
Former [2019/03] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ONLINE CALIBRATION OF A MEDICAL DEVICE WITH X-RAYS | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008130827 (KLINGENBECK-REGN KLAUS [DE]); | [X]US2012236999 (ALTVATER GREGOR [US], et al); | [Y]US2014010349 (DE GODZINSKY CHRISTIAN [FI], et al); | [XY]US2016278732 (AMIRI SHAHRAM [CA]) |