EP3428650 - METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING COGNITIVE DYSFUNCTION DISEASE BIOMARKER USING MASS SPECTROMETRY AND MASS SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Toshiya c/o Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | 02 /
KAWAKAMI, Daisuke c/o Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18183279.1 | 12.07.2018 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | JP20170137725 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017137725 | [2019/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3428650 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3428650 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (CN);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
C12Q1/56 (EP,US);
G01N30/72 (CN);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
H01J49/0031 (EP,US);
H01J49/004 (US);
H01J49/0045 (EP,US);
H01J49/4215 (US);
G01N2800/28 (EP,US);
H01J49/0036 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON BIOMARKERN FÜR KOGNITIVE DYSFUNKTIONSKRANKHEITEN MITTELS MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE UND MASSENSPEKTROMETER | [2019/03] | English: | METHOD FOR QUANTIFYING COGNITIVE DYSFUNCTION DISEASE BIOMARKER USING MASS SPECTROMETRY AND MASS SPECTROMETER | [2019/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE QUANTIFICATION DE BIOMARQUEURS DE LA MALADIE DE DYSFONCTIONNEMENT COGNITIF AU MOYEN DE LA SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE ET SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 07.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2657706 (MCBI INC [JP]) [I] 1-4 * par. 0016, 0018, 0031, 0033, 0038, 0039, 0061, 0062, 0065, 0066, 0069- 0072, 0075, 0076, 0082, 0083 *; | [A]EP2444814 (MCBI INC [JP]) [A] 1-4 * par. 0015, 0016, 0018, 0045, 0046, 0054, 0066-0073;; claims 8,9,12,13; sequences 2, 4, 6, *; | [AD]JP2012037349 (MCBI:KK) [AD] 1-4 * par.0014, 0015, 0017, 0032, 0034, 0035, 0042, 0045;; claims 5-7; sequence 6 *; | [A] - VAN DEN BROEK I ET AL, "Quantitative assay for six potential breast cancer biomarker peptides in human serum by liquid chromatography coupled to tandem mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 878, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.JCHROMB.2010.01.011, ISSN 1570-0232, (20100215), pages 590 - 602, (20100118), XP026886266 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2010.01.011 | [A] - J. A. MEAD ET AL, "MRMaid, the Web-based Tool for Designing Multiple Reaction Monitoring (MRM) Transitions", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, US, (20081115), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1074/mcp.M800192-MCP200, ISSN 1535-9476, pages 696 - 705, XP055384446 [A] 1-4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.M800192-MCP200 | by applicant | JP2010271078 | JP2012037349 | JP2012132808 | JP2016028243 | JP2016028244 | WO2014207888 | - Yoku wakaru arutsuhaimah byo—jissaini kakawaru hitono tameni (Alzheimer's Disease Understood Well-For Actual Participants |