EP3407672 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AS WELL AS USER EQUIPMENT, BASE STATION, MOBILITY MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND GATEWAY DEVICE FOR SUCH A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | 30.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Miho Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
UGA, Shinsuke Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18183906.9 | 23.04.2013 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | JP20120103541 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012103541 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407672 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, // H04W60/02, H04W84/04, H04W76/25, H04W76/28 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP);
H04W88/06 (US);
H04W60/02 (EP,US);
H04W76/25 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] |
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM SOWIE BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATION, MOBILITÄTSMANAGEMENTVORRICHTUNG UND GATEWAY-VORRICHTUNG FÜR SOLCH EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/48] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AS WELL AS USER EQUIPMENT, BASE STATION, MOBILITY MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND GATEWAY DEVICE FOR SUCH A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2018/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, AINSI QU'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR, STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE MOBILITÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PASSERELLE POUR UN TEL SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 23.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13780997.6 / EP2844023 | Divisional application(s) | EP23181262.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011141154 (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AP] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Small data fast path Establishment", vol. SA WG2, no. San Diego, CA; 20130408 - 20130412, (20130413), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-131534_SDFP_ESTABLISHMENT_V5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_96_San_Diego/Docs/, (20130413), XP050708715 [AP] 1-7 * the whole document * |