EP3598363 - RESOURCE RESERVATION FOR TRANSACTIONS OF A DISTRIBUTED DATABASE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falk, Rainer Primelweg 9 85586 Poing / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18183993.7 | 17.07.2018 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598363 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/02, G06Q20/40 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06F16/285 (EP);
G06Q20/405 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESSOURCENRESERVIERUNG FÜR TRANSAKTIONEN IN EINEM VERTEILTEN DATENBANKSYSTEM | [2020/04] | English: | RESOURCE RESERVATION FOR TRANSACTIONS OF A DISTRIBUTED DATABASE SYSTEM | [2020/04] | French: | RÉSERVATION DE RESSOURCE POUR LES TRANSACTIONS D'UN SYSTÈME DE BASE DE DONNÉES RÉPARTIES | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 17.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 22.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018096360 (CHRISTIDIS KONSTANTINOS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0064] *; | [I] - Andreas M. Antonopoulos, "Mastering Bitcoin - Unlocking Digital Cryptocurrencies", Mastering bitcoin : [unlocking digital cryptocurrencies], Beijing Cambridge Farnham Köln Sebastopol Tokyo, O'Reilly Media, (20141220), ISBN 978-1-4493-7404-4, XP055306939 [I] 1-15 * pages 111-125 * * pages 161-213 * | [I] - Satoshi Nakamoto, "Bitcoin: A Peer-to-Peer Electronic Cash System", (20081031), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://nakamotoinstitute.org/static/docs/bitcoin.pdf, (20170704), XP055387899 [I] 1-15 * pages 1-9 * | [A] - KRETSIS A ET AL, "Developing Scheduling Policies in gLite Middleware", CLUSTER COMPUTING AND THE GRID, 2009. CCGRID '09. 9TH IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090518), ISBN 978-1-4244-3935-5, pages 20 - 27, XP031473020 [A] 1-15 * pages 1-8 * | by applicant | US8300811 | US8531247 | US8843761 | US8892616 | EP2870565 | EP2891102 | US9147088 | EP2605445 | EP2976707 | US9584311 | EP3028140 | WO2017137256 | EP2870565 | - "Using encryption for authentication in large networks of computers", ROGER M. NEEDHAM; MICHAEL D. SCHROEDER, Communications of the ACM, ACM, (19781200), vol. 21 | - Blockchain Oracles, (20180712), URL: https://blockchainhub.net/blockchain-oracles/ | EP20170175275 |