EP3598529 - CONNECTION MEMBER FOR CONNECTING TO A BUSBAR OF A BATTERY, BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Belgium EC bvba Siemenslaan 14 8020 Oostkamp / BE | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Devos, Peter 32 Elzenbosselke 8730 Beernem / BE | 02 /
Maes, Henk 70 Wolfputstraat 9041 Oostakker / BE | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18184005.9 | 17.07.2018 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598529 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H01R11/00 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H01M50/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/502 (EP,KR);
H01R25/162 (US);
H01M50/503 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/522 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/526 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R31/06 (CN);
H01R4/58 (CN);
H01M2220/20 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT ZUM ANSCHLUSS AN EINE STROMSCHIENE EINER BATTERIE, BATTERIE | [2020/04] | English: | CONNECTION MEMBER FOR CONNECTING TO A BUSBAR OF A BATTERY, BATTERY | [2020/04] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONNEXION À UNE BARRE OMNIBUS DE BATTERIE, BATTERIE | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 17.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102012223812 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0030] , [0 31]; figures 3,4,5 * [I] 5,7-9,15; | [XI]US2015270666 (CALLICOAT DEBBI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0020]; figure 1 * [I] 5,7-9,15; | [XAI]US2017194071 (KROULIK ERWIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0008]; figures 1,2 * [A] 6[I] 13 |