EP3435329 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING A DISPLACEMENT OF A SCENE OBSERVED BY A DRONE, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS FOR CALCULATING GROUND SPEED OF THE DRONE, ASSOCIATED DRONE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot Drones 174-178 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REMOND, Fabien 78 Avenue Larroumes 94240 L'HAY LES ROSES / FR | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 18184109.9 | 18.07.2018 | [2019/05] | Priority number, date | FR20170057074 | 25.07.2017 Original published format: FR 1757074 | [2019/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435329 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/207 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
G06T7/207 (EP,US);
G01C11/08 (CN);
G01P3/38 (US);
G01P3/68 (CN);
G06T7/246 (US);
G06T2207/10032 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20016 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄTZEN EINER SZENENVERSCHIEBUNG, DIE VON EINER DROHNE BEOBACHTET WIRD, ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT ZUR BERECHNUNG DER BODENGESCHWINDIGKEIT DER DROHNE, ENTSPRECHENDE DROHNE UND ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2019/05] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING A DISPLACEMENT OF A SCENE OBSERVED BY A DRONE, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS FOR CALCULATING GROUND SPEED OF THE DRONE, ASSOCIATED DRONE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2019/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION D'UN DÉPLACEMENT D'UNE SCÈNE OBSERVÉE PAR UN DRONE, APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE DE CALCUL D'UNE VITESSE SOL DU DRONE, DRONE ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉS | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY] - MENG LIU ET AL, "Multi-resolution optical flow tracking algorithm based on multi-scale Harris corner points feature", CONTROL AND DECISION CONFERENCE, 2008. CCDC 2008. CHINESE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080702), ISBN 978-1-4244-1733-9, pages 5287 - 5291, XP031306030 [I] 1,6,9,10 * abstract * * "Tracking algorithm based on optical flow"; page 5287 - page 5288 * [Y] 2-5,7,8 | [Y] - DOMINIK HONEGGER ET AL, "Real-time velocity estimation based on optical flow and disparity matching", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS (IROS), 2012 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121007), doi:10.1109/IROS.2012.6385530, ISBN 978-1-4673-1737-5, pages 5177 - 5182, XP032287376 [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * "Introduction", "Background"; page 5177 - page 5178 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2012.6385530 | [Y] - CAMUS T, "Real-Time Quantized Optical Flow", REAL-TIME IMAG, ACADEMIC PRESS LIMITED, GB, (19970401), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1006/RTIM.1996.0048, ISSN 1077-2014, pages 71 - 86, XP004419617 [Y] 2-5 * abstract * * "Time-Space Trade-off"; page 73 - page 76 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/rtim.1996.0048 | [A] - Richard Szeliski, "Motion estimation Computer Vision CSE576, Spring 2005", (20050101), URL: http://slideplayer.com/slide/5373606/, (20180228), XP055455346 [A] 1-10 * Slides 1-15 * | [A] - J-Y BOUGUET, "Pyramidal Implementation of the Lucas Kanade Feature Tracker: Description of the algorithm", INTEL CORPORATION, MICROPROCESSOR RESEARCH LABS, TECHNICAL REPORT,, (19990101), pages 1 - 9, XP002536058 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |