EP3480822 - A PREDICTION MODELLING SYSTEM FOR CLINICAL TRIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icon Clinical Research Limited South County Business Park Leopardstown Dublin 18 / IE | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Ronan c/o Icon Clinical Research Ltd. South County Business Park Leopardstown Dublin 18 / IE | 02 /
KELLY, Sean c/o Icon Clinical Research Ltd. South County Business Park Leopardstown Dublin 18 / IE | 03 /
O'LEARY, Thomas c/o Icon Clinical Research Ltd. South County Business Park Leopardstown Dublin 18 / IE | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Weldon O'Brien Ltd. Shannon Lodge Casement Road Bandon County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Weldon, Michael James, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18184312.9 | 18.07.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | EP20170199577 | 01.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17199577 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480822 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/20, G06Q50/22 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G16H10/20 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q10/067 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G16H50/50 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H50/20 (US);
G16H50/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGNOSEMODELLIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KLINISCHE STUDIEN | [2019/19] | English: | A PREDICTION MODELLING SYSTEM FOR CLINICAL TRIALS | [2019/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MODÉLISATION DE PRÉVISION POUR DES ESSAIS CLINIQUES | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016357944 (IYER GIRI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0084] - [0101]; claim 1 *; | [XI]US2017053102 (KATZ DAVID P [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0135] - [0140] * [I] 5-7,11-13; | [A]US2017154166 (KLEIN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] - [0140] - [0187] * | by applicant | WO2015138338 |