EP3444818 - AN APPARATUS FOR ENCODING A SPEECH SIGNAL EMPLOYING ACELP IN THE AUTOCORRELATION DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2019/08] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bäckström, Tom Hietaniemenkatu 1 E 13 00100 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Multrus, Markus Etzlaubweg 7 90469 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Fuchs, Guillaume Joseph-Otto-Kolb-Str. 31 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | 04 /
Helmrich, Christian Fraunhoferstr. 21 10587 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Dietz, Martin Deutschherrnstr. 37 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Schairer, Oliver Michael, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Schairer, Oliver, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18184592.6 | 31.07.2013 | [2019/08] | Priority number, date | US201261710137P | 05.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261710137 P | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3444818 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3444818 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/107, G10L19/038, G10L19/00 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
G10L19/107 (EP,RU,US);
G10L19/038 (RU,US);
G10L19/04 (RU);
G10L19/10 (RU);
G10L2019/0001 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2019/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG EINES SPRACHSIGNALS MIT ACELP IM AUTOKORRELATIONSBEREICH | [2019/08] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR ENCODING A SPEECH SIGNAL EMPLOYING ACELP IN THE AUTOCORRELATION DOMAIN | [2019/08] | French: | APPAREIL POUR CODER UN SIGNAL VOCAL UTILISANT ACELP DANS LE DOMAINE D'AUTOCORRÉLATION | [2019/08] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 15.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2022 | 18.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13742646.6 / EP2904612 | Divisional application(s) | EP23160479.4 / EP4213146 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | IE | 31.07.2023 | LU | 31.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 31.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
LU | 31.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
NO | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5265167 (AKAMINE MASAMI [JP], et al); | [X]WO9805030 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]EP1833047 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |