EP3450258 - RAIL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dura Operating, LLC 1780 Pond Run Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARRON, Scott 625 River Ave Lasalle, Ontario N9J1A3 / CA | 02 /
UNVEREN, Cumhur 1201 Saratoga Boulevard Walled Lake, MI 48390 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Robert G. 565 Thornridge Dr. Rochester Hills, MI 48703 / US | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | btb IP Bungartz Baltzer Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 18184688.2 | 20.07.2018 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | US201715695207 | 05.09.2017 Original published format: US201715695207 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450258 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/04, B62D35/00 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
B60R9/04 (EP,US);
B62D21/04 (CN);
B60R13/04 (CN,US);
B62D35/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENSYSTEM | [2019/10] | English: | RAIL SYSTEM | [2019/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RAIL | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/20] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5201487 (EPPLETT RICHARD E [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 52 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6,8,10,14,15[I] 7,9,11-13; | [XAI]DE202014102150U (WKW ERBSLÖH AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-4 * [A] 14 [I] 8-13 |