EP3431851 - PUSH TO CONNECT CONDUIT FITTING WITH FERRULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swagelok Company 29500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Peter 3495 Edison Road Cleveland Heights, OH Ohio 44121 / US | 02 /
TRIVETT, Daniel G. 1422 SOM Center Road Apt. 313 Mayfield Heights, OH Ohio 44124 / US | 03 /
CLASON, Mark A. 10201 Chaffee Dodgeville Road Orwell, OH Ohio 44076 / US | 04 /
BROWN, Cal R. 1025 Windling Creek Lane Lyndhurst, OH Ohio 44124 / US | 05 /
WELCH, Douglas S. 8063 Hickory Dr. S. Chesterland, OH Ohio 44026 / US | 06 /
HAMILTON, Ronald 14829 Lisa Dr. Maple Heights, Ohio 44137 / US | 07 /
MCCLURE, Douglas J. 8020 Aileen Drive Mentor, OH Ohio 44060 / US | 08 /
KNAGGS, William J. 720 Weymouth Road Medina, OH Ohio 44256 / US | 09 /
HAMILTON, Justin 4556 Parkedge Drive Fairview Park, Ohio 44126 / US | 10 /
CHAN, Benjamin 1173 Iroquois Ave. Mayfield Heights, OH Ohio 44124 / US | 11 /
KALATA, Gregory S. 35855 Wyndemere Way Avon, OH Ohio 44011 / US | [2019/14] |
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Peter 3495 Edison Road Cleveland Heights, OH Ohio 44121 / US | ||
02 /
TRIVETT, Daniel G. 1422 SOM Center Road Apt. 313 Mayfield Heights, OH Ohio 44124 / US | |||
03 /
CLASON, Mark A. 10201 Chaffee Dodgeville Road Orwell, OH Ohio 44076 / US | |||
04 /
BROWN, Cal R. 1025 Windling Creek Lane Lyndhurst, OH Ohio 44124 / US | |||
05 /
WELCH, Douglas S. 8063 Hickory Dr. S. Chesterland, OH Ohio 44026 / US | |||
06 /
HAMILTON, Ronald 3382 East 130th Street Cleveland, OH Ohio 44120 / US | |||
07 /
MCCLURE, Douglas J. 8020 Aileen Drive Mentor, OH Ohio 44060 / US | |||
08 /
KNAGGS, William J. 720 Weymouth Road Medina, OH Ohio 44256 / US | |||
09 /
HAMILTON, Justin 2226 Woodward Ave. Lakewood, OH Ohio 44107 / US | |||
10 /
CHAN, Benjamin 1173 Iroquois Ave. Mayfield Heights, OH Ohio 44124 / US | |||
11 /
KALATA, Gregory S. 35855 Wyndemere Way Avon, OH Ohio 44011 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 18185089.2 | 14.10.2011 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | US201039349210P | 15.10.2010 Original published format: US 39349210 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431851 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/088, F16L37/092 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
F16L37/0887 (EP,US);
F16L37/26 (KR,US);
F16L37/088 (KR,US);
F16L37/092 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/0926 (EP,US);
F16L37/0927 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNELL EINRASTENDES LEITUNGSENDSTÜCK MIT HÜLSE | [2019/04] | English: | PUSH TO CONNECT CONDUIT FITTING WITH FERRULE | [2019/04] | French: | RACCORD DE CONDUIT À CONNEXION PAR PRESSION À VIROLE | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 11.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 12.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11833454.9 / EP2627938 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0715111 (LEGRIS SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 49 - column 7, line 28 * * figure - *; | [A]WO9713994 (FORM RITE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE19837355 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-14 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 6 * * figure . * [Y] 3,4,15; | [A]US2005167979 (DAHMS JASON W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006015555 (FTE AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE202006018794U (SCHAEFER STETTINER SCHRAUBEN [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019] * * figure . * [Y] 15; | [YA]WO2008051500 (SWAGELOK CO [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * [A] 1,2,5-15 | by applicant | US6629708 | US7100949 | US7240929 | US7367595 | US7614668 | US7699358 | US7762595 |