EP3453485 - NOZZLE, NOZZLE FIXING STRUCTURE, AND NOZZLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sio Co., Ltd. 705-1 Nibukata-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0822 / JP | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komazawa, Masuhiko c/o Sio Co., Ltd. 1236 Miyamacho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo, 192-0152 / JP | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 18185236.9 | 24.07.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | KR20170115171 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170115171 | JP20170179426 | 19.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017179426 | JP20170209725 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017209725 | KR20180003605 | 10.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003605 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3453485 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3453485 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/10, B05B1/14, B24B55/02 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
B23Q11/1076 (EP);
B05B15/652 (EP);
B24B55/02 (EP);
B05B1/14 (EP);
B05B15/68 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | B23Q11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜSE, DÜSENBEFESTIGUNGSSTRUKTUR UND DÜSENANORDNUNG | [2019/11] | English: | NOZZLE, NOZZLE FIXING STRUCTURE, AND NOZZLE ASSEMBLY | [2019/11] | French: | BUSE, STRUCTURE DE FIXATION DE BUSE ET ENSEMBLE BUSE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 21.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2015066659 (MINEBEA CO LTD) [I] 1-3,6-9,14 * figures 1-7 * [Y] 4,5,10,11; | [A]JP2007214201 (DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-11,14 * figures 2-8 *; | [Y]DE102016103202 (KLINGELNBERG AG [CH]) [Y] 5 * figures 2,5,8 *; | [XY]JPH0760598 (ENSHU SEISAKU KK) [X] 12 * figures 1,4 * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]EP0985490 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * figure 1 * | by applicant | JPS60175981U | JP2013022717 |