EP3438447 - PROVIDING CONTROL POWER DURING THE OPERATION OF A REGENERATIVE POWER GENERATION UNIT, IN PARTICULAR WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Service GmbH Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geisler, Jens Waldstraße 28a 24768 Rendsburg / DE | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 18186257.4 | 30.07.2018 | [2019/06] | Priority number, date | DE20171007132 | 31.07.2017 Original published format: DE102017007132 | [2019/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438447 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3438447 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D7/04, H02J3/38 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
F03D7/0284 (EP,US);
H02J3/382 (CN);
F03D7/028 (US);
F03D9/257 (US);
G05B19/04 (US);
G06Q10/0631 (CN);
G06Q50/06 (CN);
H02J3/38 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/386 (CN);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
F05B2260/84 (EP,US);
F05B2270/1033 (EP,CN,US);
F05B2270/32 (EP,US);
F05B2270/321 (EP,US);
F05B2270/335 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2619 (US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] |
Former [2019/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLEN VON REGELLEISTUNG BEIM BETRIEB EINER REGENERATIVEN STROMERZEUGUNGSEINHEIT, INSBESONDERE WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2019/06] | English: | PROVIDING CONTROL POWER DURING THE OPERATION OF A REGENERATIVE POWER GENERATION UNIT, IN PARTICULAR WIND TURBINE | [2019/06] | French: | FOURNITURE DE PUISSANCE DE RÉGULATION LORS DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE UNITÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE RENOUVELABLE, EN PARTICULIER D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2019/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 06.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2022 | 12.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23177571.9 / EP4236004 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 30.07.2023 | LU | 30.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102010014165 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0020] , [0045] *; | [XY]DE102012215565 (ENERGY & METEO SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document * [Y] 12; | [A]DE102013215396 (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0007] - [0016] - [0034] - [0052] *; | [Y]DE102015114958 (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0023] - [0034] * |