EP3605044 - DETECTOR, METHODS FOR OPERATING A DETECTOR AND DETECTOR PIXEL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker Nano GmbH Am Studio 2 D 12489 Berlin / DE | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goran, Daniel Radu Semelweisstr. 63b 12524 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Bombelli, Luca Galileo Galilei n° 1 20023 Cerro Maggiore, Milano / IT | 03 /
Trigilio, Paolo Viale Francia 25 Melzo 20066 milan / IT | [2023/30] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
Goran, Daniel Radu Semelweisstr. 63b 12524 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Bombelli, Luca Galileo Galilei n° 1 20023 Cerro Maggiore, Milano / IT | |||
03 /
Trigilio, Paolo Via don Galimberti 7 20064 Gorgonzola Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18187018.9 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605044 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3605044 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/46, G01T1/29, H01L27/146, G01J1/44, H04N25/75, H04N25/42 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G01J1/46 (EP,US);
H04N25/42 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N25/78 (EP);
G01J2001/446 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | G01J1/46, G01J1/44, H01L27/146, H04N5/369, G01T1/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | DETEKTOR, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES DETEKTORS UND DETEKTORPIXELSCHALTUNG | [2020/06] | English: | DETECTOR, METHODS FOR OPERATING A DETECTOR AND DETECTOR PIXEL CIRCUIT | [2020/06] | French: | DÉTECTEUR, PROCÉDÉS DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DÉTECTEUR ET CIRCUIT DE PIXELS DE DÉTECTEUR | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 10.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 02.08.2023 | LU | 02.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NO | 26.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002191828 (COLBETH RICHARD E [US], et al); | [A]US6593562 (PARRISH WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [XI]US2007120062 (LI WEN [US], et al); | [I]US2009080601 (TKACZYK JOHN ERIC [US], et al); | [XI]US2014027606 (RAYNOR JEFFREY M [GB], et al); | [X]US2014232841 (OHTA YASUNORI [JP], et al); | [I]US2017212253 (FU GENG [US], et al); | [I]US2018196149 (BLEVIS IRA MICAH [IL], et al) |