EP3604932 - DOOR LOCK SYSTEM FOR AN APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AKTIEBOLAG S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREMON, Diego Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Bodelschwinghstr. 1 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 02 /
SPECHT, Trevor Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Bodelschwinghstr. 1 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 03 /
WEBER, Mario Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Bodelschwinghstr. 1 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/06] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18187081.7 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604932 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3604932 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02, E05C5/00, E05B17/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
F24C15/022 (EP,US);
E05B17/0029 (US);
E05B17/0025 (EP,US);
E05C5/00 (EP,US);
Y10S292/69 (US);
Y10T292/1082 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TÜRSCHLOSSSYSTEM FÜR EIN GERÄT | [2020/06] | English: | DOOR LOCK SYSTEM FOR AN APPLIANCE | [2020/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE DE PORTE POUR APPAREIL | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 05.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | IE | 02.08.2023 | LU | 02.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GB | 21.09.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
IE | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 21.09.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5401067 (KUROSAKI MUTSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 11-13 *; | [X]US2006012187 (ADACHI TAKEFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 6-8 *; | [X]US2007080546 (CHOU CHIN-WEN [TW]) [X] 1* figure 3 *; | [X]US2013234578 (ALA GIANBATTISTA [IT], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0045]; figures 2-4 * | Examination | EP1703212 | US7481469 |