EP3415521 - METAL COMPLEXES COMPRISING AZABENZIMIDAZOLE CARBENE LIGANDS AND THE USE THEREOF IN OLEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UDC Ireland Limited Blanchardstown Corporate Park 2 Ballycoolin, Dublin 15 / IE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METZ, Stefan Keplerstr. 41 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
FUCHS, Evelyn Eugen-Richter-Str. 7-9 68199 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
DORMANN, Korinna Portugieser Str. 21 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 04 /
MOLT, Oliver Wintergasse 46 69469 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
LENNARTZ, Christian Hans-Purrmann-Str. 24 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 06 /
WAGENBLAST, Gerhard Am Judenacker 8 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 07 /
GEßNER, Thomas Gundolfstr. 1 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 08 /
SCHILDKNECHT, Christian 451 Lowell Place Fremont, CA California 94536 / US | 09 /
WATANABE, Soichi Werderstr. 17 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18187168.2 | 12.06.2012 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | EP20110169895 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: EP 11169895 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415521 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C09K11/06, H05B33/00 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
C07F15/0033 (EP,CN,KR);
C07F15/0086 (CN);
C09K11/06 (EP,CN);
H05B33/14 (EP,CN);
H10K50/14 (KR);
H10K50/16 (CN);
H10K50/18 (CN);
H10K85/342 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K85/346 (CN);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/185 (EP,CN);
H10K85/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | METALLKOMPLEXE MIT AZABENZIMIDAZOLCARBENLIGANDEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON IN OLEDS | [2018/51] | English: | METAL COMPLEXES COMPRISING AZABENZIMIDAZOLE CARBENE LIGANDS AND THE USE THEREOF IN OLEDS | [2018/51] | French: | COMPLEXES DE MÉTAL COMPRENANT DES LIGANDS DE CARBÈNE D'AZABENZIMIDAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES OLED | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12800656.6 / EP2721043 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2006056418 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [E]WO2012121936 (UNIVERSAL DISPLAY CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0032717 | WO0070655 | EP1097981 | WO0215645 | WO2005019373 | WO2005113704 | EP1658343 | WO2006056418 | WO2006121811 | WO2006128800 | EP1786050 | WO2007077810 | WO2007108459 | WO2007108362 | US2007224446 | WO2007114244 | WO2007115970 | WO2007115981 | WO2007119816 | WO2008000727 | JP2008021687 | WO2008029729 | WO2008029652 | JP2008066569 | WO2008034758 | WO2008035571 | JP2008074939 | JP2008084913 | EP1837926 | JP2008127326 | WO2008072596 | WO2008090912 | JP2008207520 | EP1970371 | EP1988587 | WO2008140114 | WO2008146838 | WO2008156105 | WO2009003919 | WO2009003898 | WO2009008100 | WO2009008099 | US2009017331 | JP2009021336 | JP2009059767 | WO2009046266 | WO2009060742 | WO2009060757 | WO2009060780 | WO2009060779 | WO2009063757 | US2009134784 | JP2009114369 | JP2009114370 | JP2009135183 | US2009153034 | WO2009086028 | WO2009084413 | JP2009170764 | JP2009182298 | WO2009104488 | JP2009267255 | US2009284138 | WO2010001830 | WO2010004877 | JP2010021336 | JP2010040830 | WO2010040777 | WO2010044342 | EP2180029 | JP2010114180 | JP2010135467 | WO2010067746 | WO2010079678 | WO2010079051 | WO2010087222 | WO2010090077 | WO2010095564 | WO2011051404 | WO2004EP09269 | EP20090153776 | EP20100166507 | US20100356057 | EP20100168921 | US20100362314 |