EP3447397 - AIR CLEANING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microjet Technology Co., Ltd No. 28, R&D 2nd Rd Science-based Industrial Park Hsinchu / TW | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mou, Hao-Jan No. 28, R&D 2nd Rd., Science-Based Industrial Park Taiwan, R.O.C. Hsinchu / TW | 02 /
Huang, Chi-Feng No. 28, R&D 2nd Rd., Science-Based Industrial Park Taiwan, R.O.C. Hsinchu / TW | 03 /
Han, Yung-Lung No. 28, R&D 2nd Rd., Science-Based Industrial Park Taiwan, R.O.C. Hsinchu / TW | 04 /
Chen, Hsuan-Kai No. 28, R&D 2nd Rd., Science-Based Industrial Park Taiwan, R.O.C. Hsinchu / TW | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18187201.1 | 03.08.2018 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | TW20170128915 | 25.08.2017 Original published format: TW 106128915 | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/18] | TW20170128915 | 25.07.2017 | |
Former [2019/09] | TW20210628915 | 25.08.2017 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447397 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3447397 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/16, B01D53/22, F04B43/04, F04B53/16, F24F11/77 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B01D53/0407 (EP,US);
B01D53/0454 (EP,US);
F04B39/121 (US);
F04B39/123 (US);
F04B39/16 (US);
F04B45/047 (EP,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B53/16 (US);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F24F8/108 (EP,US);
F24F8/158 (EP,US);
G01N33/0027 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,US);
F24F2110/65 (EP,US);
F24F2110/70 (EP,US);
F24F2110/72 (EP,US);
F24F2110/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/09] | English: | AIR CLEANING APPARATUS | [2019/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE D'AIR | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 16.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009007778 (ZHANG YUE [CN]) [A] 2,7,10 * paragraph [0017]; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2012118553 (CHANG YAO-TING [TW], et al) [A] 2,3,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP2568175 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 13,14* abstract *; | [X]WO2014163270 (MIRYUNG ECO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * figure 7; claim 16 *; | [X]US2015323217 (KRICHTAFOVITCH IGOR [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] *; | [XI]WO2015193690 (INVENTURE FUELS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,15 * page 3, lines 5-43; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-14; | [A]EP2998582 (MICROJET TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [TW]) [A] 13,14 * abstract *; | [A]EP3015779 (XIAOMI INC [CN]) [A] 2-5,10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0024] , [0044]; claims 1,3,6 *; | [A]EP3181212 (K & N ENG INC [US]) [A] 8 * abstract * |