EP3609213 - METHOD FOR GEOMETRIC PLANNING OF VICINITIES OF MOBILE RADIO LOCATIONS IN A MOBILE RADIO NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barenthin, Peter Müggelstr. 18 15738 Zeuthen / DE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | RDL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Raible Deissler Lehmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 18187480.1 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609213 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609213 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/18, H04W36/00, H04W24/02 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
H04W16/18 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEOMETRISCHEN PLANUNG VON NACHBARSCHAFTEN VON MOBILFUNKSTANDORTEN IN EINEM MOBILFUNKNETZ | [2020/07] | English: | METHOD FOR GEOMETRIC PLANNING OF VICINITIES OF MOBILE RADIO LOCATIONS IN A MOBILE RADIO NETWORK | [2020/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONCEPTION GÉOMÉTRIQUE DES ZONES DE VOISINAGE DES EMPLACEMENTS DE L'ÉQUIPEMENT DE TÉLÉPHONIE MOBILE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉPHONIE MOBILE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 29.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.01.2022 | 28.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2018 | AL | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | TR | 13.07.2022 | IE | 06.08.2022 | LU | 06.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | FR | 13.09.2022 | GB | 13.10.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.08.2018 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
GB | 13.10.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 06.08.2018 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
GB | 13.10.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.08.2018 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
GB | 13.10.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.08.2018 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
GB | 13.10.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
GB | 13.10.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
GB | 13.10.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 13.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2009083035 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) |