EP3429232 - ONLINE ANTI-FEEDBACK SYSTEM FOR A HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2023/02] |
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boldt, Jesper Bünsow Kærlodden 34 2760 Måløv / DK | 02 /
Elmedyb, Thomas Bo Mosedraget 19A 2730 Herlev / DK | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2023/02] |
Former [2019/03] | William Demant Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 18187832.3 | 12.06.2007 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429232 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429232 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04R25/453 (EP,US);
H04R2430/03 (EP,US);
H04R25/505 (EP,US);
H04R25/552 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ONLINE-RÜCKKOPPELUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EIN HÖRGERÄT | [2022/36] | English: | ONLINE ANTI-FEEDBACK SYSTEM FOR A HEARING AID | [2019/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ANTI-FEEDBACK EN LIGNE POUR APPAREIL D'AIDE AUDITIVE | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/03] | ONLINE-RÜCKKOPPLUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EIN HÖRGERÄT | ||
Former [2019/03] | SYSTÈME ANTI-FEEDBACK EN LIGNE POUR APPAREIL D'AIDE AUDITIVE | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07110079.6 / EP2003928 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | IT | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | IE | 12.06.2023 | LU | 12.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1191814 (TOEPHOLM & WESTERMANN [DK]) [X] 1,2,8,11,14,15 * page 9, line 41 - page 10, line 56; figures 1-3 * * page 12, line 8 - line 38 * [I] 3-7,9,10,12,13,16-20; | [X]US2004136557 (KAULBERG THOMAS [DK]) [X] 1,14,15 * page 7, paragraph 92 - page 9, paragraph 121; figures 1-3 *; | [XDI]WO2006063624 (WIDEX AS [DK], et al) [XD] 1,11,14,15 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 28 * * page 7, line 1 - line 29 * [I] 3-5,9-13,16,17; | [E]WO2007113282 (WIDEX AS [DK], et al) [E] 1,15 * page 6, line 22 - line 31 ** page 23, line 13 - page 26, line 25 * | Examination | WO2007053896 |