EP3441928 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DOMAIN NAME VALUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verisign, Inc. 12061 Bluemont Way Reston Virginia 20190 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, William c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | 02 /
NAMATA, Mark Galileo c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | 03 /
SIMPSON, Andrew c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | 04 /
WALKER, Scott c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 18188031.1 | 08.08.2018 | [2019/07] | Priority number, date | US201715672664 | 09.08.2017 Original published format: US201715672664 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441928 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, H04L29/12 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0206 (EP,US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
H04L61/302 (EP,US);
G06F16/90332 (US);
H04L2101/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG VON DOMÄNENNAMEN | [2019/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DOMAIN NAME VALUATION | [2019/07] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE NOM DE DOMAINE | [2019/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009254545 (FISKEN ALEX [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0047] *; | [I]US2010058210 (JOHNSON SIMON [AU]) [I] 1-14 * column 8, paragraph 23 - column 9, paragraph 64 *; | [I]US2017186061 (MINARDOS GEORGE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0065] *; | [I] - IPARRAGUIRRE JULIO BERNABE CORDERO, "Evaluation and economic valorization of websites using the technical evaluation and economic valorization methodology (ETVE)", 2016 SAI COMPUTING CONFERENCE (SAI), IEEE, (20160713), doi:10.1109/SAI.2016.7556061, pages 725 - 733, XP032955165 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SAI.2016.7556061 | by applicant | US9218334 |