EP3450434 - DEUTERATED DERIVATIVES OF RUXOLITINIB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states CoNCERT Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 65 Hayden Avenue, Suite 3000N Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Concert Pharmaceuticals Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue, Suite 500 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERMAN, I. Robert 36 Orvis Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 02 /
LIU, Julie F. 3 Whitman Circle Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 03 /
MORGAN, Adam J. 14 Oak Ridge Lane Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 04 /
PANDYA, Bhaumik 325 Springs Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 05 /
HARBESON, Scott L. 355 Shore Dr Ellenton, FL 34222-2025 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
SILVERMAN, I. Robert 36 Orvis Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Julie F. 3 Whitman Circle Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
03 /
MORGAN, Adam J. 14 Oak Ridge Lane Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
04 /
PANDYA, Bhaumik 28 Silk Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
05 /
HARBESON, Scott L. 355 Shore Dr Ellenton, FL 34222-2025 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Snodin, Michael D. Park Grove IP BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 18188152.5 | 14.06.2013 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | US201261660428P | 15.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261660428 P | US201261678795P | 02.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261678795 P | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450434 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3450434 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07B59/00, A61K31/519, A61P35/02 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07B2200/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 06.09.2019 | ME | 06.09.2019 | Title | German: | DEUTERIERTE DERIVATE VON RUXOLITINIB | [2019/10] | English: | DEUTERATED DERIVATIVES OF RUXOLITINIB | [2019/10] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DEUTÉRÉS DE RUXOLITINIB | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13732046.1 / EP2861600 | Divisional application(s) | EP21156398.6 / EP3882249 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2021
25.11.2021
ADMISSIBLE INCYTE CORPORATION 1801 Augustine Cut-Off Wilmington DE 19803 / US Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/52] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 09.12.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.04.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.02.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 27.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0472/24 | 27.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.06.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2013 | AL | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | MT | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | LU | 14.06.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 14.06.2013 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.06.2013 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]US2007135461 (RODGERS JAMES D [US], et al) [ID] 1-12 * Abstract; claims; pages 38-39, paragraph 0320; page 61: example 67. * [Y] 1-12; | [Y] - OSTOJIC ET AL., "Ruxolitinib: a new JAK1/2 inhibitor that offers promising options for treatment of myelofibrosis", FUTURE ONCOLOGY, (20110101), vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.2217/FON.11.81, ISSN 1479-6694, pages 1035 - 1043, XP008150477 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/fon.11.81 | [YD] - SHILLING ET AL., "Metabolism, Excretion, and Pharmacokinetics of [14C]INCB018424, a Selective Janus Tyrosine Kinase 1/2 Inhibitor, in Humans", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (20101101), vol. 38, no. 11, doi:10.1124/dmd.110.033787, ISSN 0090-9556, pages 2023 - 2031, XP055071854 [YD] 1-12 * Page 2016, right column 1st sentence; page 2028, figure 2; page 2030, left column to right column, paragraph 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.110.033787 | [L] - BUTEAU, "Deuterated Drugs: Unexpectedly Nonobvious?", vol. X, no. 1, ISSN 1536-7983, (20090101), pages 22 - 74, JOURNAL OF HIGH TECHNOLOGY LAW, SUFFOLK UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL, US, URL: http://www.law.suffolk.edu/highlights/stuorgs/jhtl/docs/pdf/Buteau_10JHTL1.pdf, (20090101), XP002636702 [L] 1-12 * Page 62, footnotes 248, 249 on predictability and obviousness; paragraph bridging pages 64-65; page 69, paragraph 2; page 72, last sentence to page 73, end of paragraph 1. Cited as common general knowledge. * | Examination | WO2014078486 | - EMA/465846/2012: CHMP assessment report for Jakavi, 19 April 2012, 84 pages. | - "Study of Ruxolitinib (INCB018424) Sustained Release Formulation in Myelofibrosis Patients", (20110422), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT01340651 | by applicant | US5304121 | US5886026 | US6099562 | US6803031 | US7014866 | US2006079502 | US2006094744 | US2008312258 | US7598257 | WO2010083283 | - KEMPF, D.J. et al., Antimicrobial agents and chemotherapy, (19970000), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 654 - 60 | - WANG, L et al., Clinical Pharmacology and Therapeutics, (19940000), vol. 56, no. 6, pages 659 - 67 | - BLAKE, MI et al., J Pharm Sci, (19750000), vol. 64, pages 367 - 91 | - FOSTER, AB, Adv Drug Res, (19850000), vol. 14, pages 1 - 40 | - KUSHNER, DJ et al., Can J Physiol Pharmacol, (19990000), pages 79 - 88 | - FISHER, MB et al., Curr Opin Drug Discov Devel, (20060000), vol. 9, pages 101 - 09 | - FUKUTO et al., J. Med. Chem., (19910000), vol. 34, pages 2871 - 76 | - SHILLING, A.D. et al., Drug Metabolism and Disposition, (20100000), vol. 38, no. 11, pages 2023 - 2031 | - WADA, E et al., Seikagaku, (19940000), vol. 66, page 15 | - GANNES, LZ et al., Comp Biochem Physiol Mol Integr Physiol, (19980000), vol. 119, page 725 | - Organic Letters, (20090000), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 1999 - 2009 | - LIN, Q. et al., Org. Lett., (20090000), vol. 11, page 1999 | - FREIREICH et al., Cancer Chemother. Rep, (19660000), vol. 50, page 219 | - Scientific Tables, Geigy Pharmaceuticals, (19700000), page 537 | - LIN, Q. et al., Org. Lett., (20090000), vol. 11, pages 1999 - 2002 | Opposition | US2007135461 | US7855204 | WO2013188783 | - Ostojic Alen; Vrhovac Radovan; Verstovsek Srdan, "Ruxolitinib: a new JAK1/2 inhibitor that offers promising options for treatment of myelofibrosis", FUTURE ONCOLOGY, FUTURE MEDICINE LTD., LONDON, GB, GB , (20110101), vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.2217/fon.11.81, ISSN 1479-6694, pages 1035 - 1043, XP008150477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/fon.11.81 | - A. D. Shilling, F. M. Nedza, T. Emm, S. Diamond, E. Mckeever, N. Punwani, W. Williams, A. Arvanitis, L. G. Galya, M. Li, S. Shepard, J. Rodgers, T.-Y. Yue, S. Yeleswaram, "Metabolism, Excretion, and Pharmacokinetics of [14C]INCB018424, a Selective Janus Tyrosine Kinase 1/2 Inhibitor, in Humans", Drug Metabolism and Disposition, ¬American Society for Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, etc.|, (20101101), vol. 38, no. 11, doi:10.1124/dmd.110.033787, ISSN 00909556, pages 2023 - 2031, XP055071854 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.110.033787 | - BUTEAU K C, "Deuterated Drugs: Unexpectedly Nonobvious?", JOURNAL OF HIGH TECHNOLOGY LAW, SUFFOLK UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL,, US, US , (20090101), vol. X, no. 1, ISSN 1536-7983, pages 22 - 74, XP002636702 | - A. YARNELL, "Heavy-Hydrogen Drugs Turn Heads, Again", Chem. Eng. News, (20090000), vol. 87, no. 25, pages 36 - 39, XP002546075 |