EP3450625 - DRAINAGE FOIL FOR A PAPER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bartelmuss, Klaus Hauptstrasse 22 8833 Teufenbach / AT | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 18188284.6 | 09.08.2018 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | AT20170000344 | 28.08.2017 Original published format: AT 3442017 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450625 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/48, D21F1/52 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
D21F1/483 (EP,AT,US);
D21F1/52 (AT);
D21F1/0027 (CN);
D21F1/20 (AT,US);
D21F1/523 (EP,US);
D21F7/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTREIFLEISTE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PAPIERBANDES | [2019/10] | English: | DRAINAGE FOIL FOR A PAPER MACHINE | [2019/10] | French: | RACLE D'ÉGOUTTAGE POUR MACHINE À PAPIER | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4420370 (SAAD NABIL R [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10,15 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US4425188 (FUJIWARA HARUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9-11,15 * column 1, lines 7-12 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 20; figure 4 * [Y] 3,14; | [X]US4687549 (KALLMES OTTO J [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,15 * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 23; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0350827 (FELDMUEHLE AG [DE]) [Y] 3,14* column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 47; figure 1 *; | [X]US5080760 (SMITH DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10,15 * column 6, lines 6-46; figures 3A-3C *; | [X]US5735330 (BUCHMANN WERNER [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,15 * column 4, line 44 - column 7, line 3; figures 2-11 * |