EP3611542 - PROXIMITY SENSOR AND METHOD OF OPERATING A PHOTODETECTOR BASED PROXIMITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Research & Development) Limited Atlas House Third Avenue Globe Park Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1EY / GB | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, John Kevin 2 Bonaly Brae Colinton Edinburgh, EH13 0QF / GB | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Smith, Gary John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 18188750.6 | 13.08.2018 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611542 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/36, G01S7/491, G01S7/493, G01S7/497, // G01S17/93 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
G01S17/36 (EP);
G01J1/44 (CN);
H03K17/943 (US);
G01S7/4913 (EP);
G01S7/4915 (EP);
G01S7/493 (EP);
G01S7/497 (EP);
H01L31/02327 (US);
H01L31/125 (US);
H03K17/945 (US);
G01J2001/442 (CN);
G01J2001/4466 (CN);
G01S17/931 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NÄHERUNGSSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES PHOTODETEKTORBASIERTEN NÄHERUNGSSENSORS | [2020/08] | English: | PROXIMITY SENSOR AND METHOD OF OPERATING A PHOTODETECTOR BASED PROXIMITY SENSOR | [2020/08] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PROXIMITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CAPTEUR DE PROXIMITÉ BASÉ SUR UN PHOTODÉTECTEUR | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2023 | 04.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/47] | 15.07.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2505705 (ST MICROELECTRONICS RES & DEV [GB]); |