EP3447262 - ENGINE, FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR ENGINE, METHOD OF CONTROLLING ENGINE, METHOD OF CONTROLLING FUEL INJECTION DEVICE, CONTROL DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Kota c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
URUSHIHARA, Tomonori c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
SUEOKA, Masanari c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
MARUYAMA, Keiji c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
MIYAMOTO, Toru c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 06 /
KOSHIRO, Yudai c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 07 /
PAK, Gyetae c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18188802.5 | 14.08.2018 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | JP20170161687 | 25.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161687 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447262 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02B23/08, F02B1/12, F02M61/18, F02D41/40 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
F02D41/3041 (EP,US);
F02D43/00 (CN);
F02D19/024 (US);
F02D19/0642 (US);
F02D19/0689 (US);
F02D19/0694 (US);
F02D41/0062 (US);
F02D41/3047 (EP,US);
F02D41/401 (EP,US);
F02D41/402 (EP,US);
F02M21/0278 (EP,US);
F02M61/14 (EP,US);
F02M61/1806 (US);
F01B11/00 (EP,US);
F02B2023/106 (EP,US);
F02B2023/108 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0015 (EP,US);
F02D41/3023 (EP,US);
F02M21/0275 (EP,US);
F02M2200/44 (US);
F02M2200/46 (US);
F02M61/1893 (US);
F02M67/14 (US);
Y02T10/30 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR, KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOTOR, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES MOTORS, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2019/09] | English: | ENGINE, FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR ENGINE, METHOD OF CONTROLLING ENGINE, METHOD OF CONTROLLING FUEL INJECTION DEVICE, CONTROL DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2019/09] | French: | MOTEUR, DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 14.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.09.2021 | 01.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/03] | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 12.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2012067695 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 2,10,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 1,6,11; | [I]US2016290273 (OCHI YUTA [JP]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0058] - [0069] * * figures 1, 2, 7, 9 *; | [XP]WO2018096746 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [XP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0098] - [0101] * * paragraphs [0232] - [0331] *; | [I] - DIPANKAR SAHOO ET AL, "The Impact of Swirl Ratio and Injection Pressure on Fuel-Air Mixing in a Light-Duty Diesel Engine", ASME 2012 INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE DIVISION SPRING TECHNICAL CONFERENCE, US, (20120506), doi:10.1115/ICES2012-81234, ISBN 978-0-7918-4466-3, page 393, XP055535923 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/ICES2012-81234 | [I] - Slavey Tanov, "Investigation of Partially Premixed Combustion in an Optical Engine In-Cylinder Flow and Combustion Characterization", Lund, SE, (20170522), pages 1 - 85, URL: http://portal.research.lu.se/portal/files/25884568/Final_20170522_plain.pdf, (20181218), XP055535933 [I] 1,2,8,11-14 * pages 44-51 * | [A] - HÅKAN PERSSON ET AL, "The Effect of Swirl on Spark Assisted Compression Ignition (SACI)", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, US, (20070723), vol. 1, doi:10.4271/2007-01-1856, ISSN 0148-7191, pages 1 - 1856, XP055536914 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4271/2007-01-1856 | by applicant | JP2009108778 |