EP3444775 - SINGLE PASS RENDERING FOR HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENNEY, Simon Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 18189069.0 | 14.08.2018 | [2019/08] | Priority number, date | GB20170013052 | 15.08.2017 Original published format: GB 201713052 | GB20180005677 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: GB 201805677 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3444775 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3444775 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/00 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
G06T3/047 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (GB,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,GB,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G03B21/147 (US);
G06T1/20 (GB);
G06T15/00 (GB,US);
G06T15/205 (US);
G06T3/18 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (US);
H04N13/332 (GB);
H04N13/344 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINZELSCHRITT-RENDERING FÜR HEAD-MOUNTED-DISPLAYS | [2023/12] | English: | SINGLE PASS RENDERING FOR HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAYS | [2019/08] | French: | RENDU À PASSAGE UNIQUE POUR AFFICHAGES MONTÉS SUR LA TÊTE | [2019/08] |
Former [2019/08] | EINZELSCHRITT-RENDERING FÜR KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGEN | Examination procedure | 16.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 16.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5319744 (KELLY WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 52 *; | [A]WO2014095480 (THALES SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 13 - page 3, line 4 * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 14 *; | [X] - WARREN ROBINETT ET AL, "The visual display transformation for virtual reality", TR94-031, (19940930), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 1 - 30, XP055076429 [X] 1-15 * page 23, paragraph 2 - page 25, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/pres.1995.4.1.1 | [A] - RYUGO KIJIMA ET AL, "A Development of Reflex HMD - HMD with time delay compensation capability -", PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MIXED REALITY, ISMR2001; YOKOHAMA (JAPAN), (20010314), pages 40 - 47, XP002712316 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 42, column r, paragraph 3 - page 43, column r, paragraph 1 * | [A] - J. Radatz, "Tile", The IEEE Standard Dictionary of Electrical and Electronics Terms, New York, NY, Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, (19960101), pages 1113 - 1113, ISBN 978-1-55937-833-8, XP055540920 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2016168913 | by applicant | GB2401522 |