EP3445066 - CARTILAGE CONDUCTION AUDIO SYSTEM FOR EYEWEAR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Antonio John c/o Oculus VR, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US | 02 /
MEHRA, Ravish c/o Oculus VR, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/24] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/08] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18189104.5 | 15.08.2018 | [2019/08] | Priority number, date | US201715680836 | 18.08.2017 Original published format: US201715680836 | WO2018IB46046 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: PCT/US2018/046046 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3445066 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3445066 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/26, // H04R1/02, H04R29/00, H04R1/10, H04S7/00, H04R7/12 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
H04R1/26 (EP);
H04R1/028 (EP);
H04R1/1091 (EP);
H04R2460/13 (EP);
H04R29/001 (EP);
H04R7/12 (EP);
H04S7/301 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2019/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KNORPELLEITERAUDIOSYSTEM FÜR BRILLENVORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/08] | English: | CARTILAGE CONDUCTION AUDIO SYSTEM FOR EYEWEAR DEVICES | [2019/08] | French: | SYSTÈME AUDIO DE CONDUCTION DU CARTILAGE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE LUNETTERIE | [2019/08] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 15.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2021 | 03.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.08.2018 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | IE | 15.08.2021 | LU | 15.08.2021 | FR | 16.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 15.08.2018 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 15.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
FR | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 15.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
FR | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 15.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
FR | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 15.08.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
FR | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
FR | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 15.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013216052 (BRUSS JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0019] - [0032] *; | [XYI]US9288591 (DONG JIANCHUN [US], et al) [X] 8,10,12 * column 6, lines 4-36; figure 1B * [Y] 1-7,9,11,14,15 [I] 13; | [YA]EP3125573 (TEMCO JAPAN [JP]) [Y] 3,11 * paragraph [0011] * [A] 1,2,4-10,12-15; | [YA]EP3160163 (OTICON MEDICAL AS [DK]) [Y] 1-7,9,14,15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0025] , [0053] , [0054] * [A] 8,10-13 |