EP3534061 - VEHICLE LUMINAIRE AND VEHICLE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Misaki Toshiba Lighting & Techology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 18189355.3 | 16.08.2018 | [2019/36] | Priority number, date | JP20180035461 | 28.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018035461 | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534061 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F21S41/19, F21S41/151 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
F21S41/192 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (US);
F21S41/151 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (US);
F21V17/14 (US);
F21V23/06 (US);
F21V29/773 (US);
F21V29/87 (US);
H01L33/486 (US);
H01L33/52 (US);
H01L33/62 (US);
H01L33/641 (US);
F21S43/30 (US);
F21V23/005 (US);
F21Y2115/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLEUCHTE UND FAHRZEUGLAMPE | [2019/36] | English: | VEHICLE LUMINAIRE AND VEHICLE LAMP | [2019/36] | French: | LUMINAIRE DE VÉHICULE ET PHARE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 11.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005041434 (YATSUDA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0081] * * figure 8 * [I] 6-8; | [XI]DE202006009693U (WU CHIH HSIEN [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 11 *[I] 6-8; | [XI]FR2889869 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,9 * page 11, line 4 - page 18, line 25 * * figures 2,9,10 * [I] 6-8; | [XI]US2010020541 (INCORVIA SAMUEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 11,12 * [I] 6-8; | [XI]WO2012164506 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0089] * * figures 4,5 * [I] 6-8; | [A]US2015153026 (CHEN YU-SYUAN [TW]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 1 * |