EP3611541 - METHOD OF DETERMINING AN UNCERTAINTY ESTIMATE OF AN ESTIMATED VELOCITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Spitalstrasse 5 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2024/39] |
Former [2024/18] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stachnik, Mateusz Wiatowice 55 32-420 Gdów / PL | 02 /
Cieslar, Dariusz ul. Federowicza 27/20 30-392 Kraków / PL | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18189410.6 | 16.08.2018 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611541 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3611541 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/931, G01S13/42, G01S13/58, G01S7/292, // G01S7/295, G01S13/72 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01P21/02 (CN);
G01P3/665 (US);
G01S13/42 (EP);
G01S13/581 (CN);
G01S13/584 (EP);
G01S13/60 (CN);
G01S7/40 (CN);
G06F17/16 (US);
G06N5/022 (US);
G01S13/589 (EP);
G01S13/726 (EP);
G01S2013/932 (EP);
G01S2013/93271 (EP);
G01S2013/93274 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | G01S13/93, G01S13/42, G01S13/58, G01S7/292, // G01S7/295, G01S13/72 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER UNSICHERHEITSSCHÄTZUNG EINER GESCHÄTZTEN GESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2020/08] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINING AN UNCERTAINTY ESTIMATE OF AN ESTIMATED VELOCITY | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE ESTIMATION D'INCERTITUDE D'UNE VITESSE ESTIMÉE | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 17.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3285230 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) |