EP3613521 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPONENT THROUGH POSITIONING OF PARTICLE-FILLED, STRUCTURED LAYER ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuh, Carsten Heideweg 9 85598 Baldham / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18189843.8 | 21.08.2018 | [2020/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613521 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/00, B22F3/18, B22F3/22, B22F3/10, B33Y10/00, B28B1/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/12 (EP,US);
B22F3/10 (EP);
B22F3/22 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B22F3/02 (EP);
B22F3/1021 (EP);
B22F3/18 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/12, B22F7/062, B22F3/18, B22F3/1021, B22F3/10 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/20, B22F10/12 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F7/062, B22F3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BAUTEILS DURCH POSITIONIEREN VON PARTIKELGEFÜLLTEN, STRUKTURIERTEN SCHICHTELEMENTEN | [2020/09] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPONENT THROUGH POSITIONING OF PARTICLE-FILLED, STRUCTURED LAYER ELEMENTS | [2020/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT PAR POSITIONNEMENT DES ÉLÉMENTS STRATIFIÉS STRUCTURÉS REMPLIS DE PARTICULES | [2020/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5779833 (CAWLEY JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * column 5, line 40 - column 12, line 2 ** figures 1-3, 5 *; | [X] - CAWLEY J D ET AL, "COMPUTER-AIDED MANUFACTURING OF LAMINATED ENGINEERING MATERIALS", AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19960501), vol. 75, no. 5, ISSN 0002-7812, pages 75 - 79, XP000587172 [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * pages 75-79 * | [X] - J. D. Cawley ET AL, "Materials Issues in Laminated Object Manufacturing of Powder-Based Systems", Proceedings of the Annual International Solid Freeform Fabrication Symposium 1998, (19980101), page 503, URL: http://sffsymposium.engr.utexas.edu/Manuscripts/1998/1998-56-Cawley.pdf, (20190212), XP055555109 [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * abschnitte Introduction, Laminated Object Manufacturing und Materials Systems * |