EP3454577 - SOUND TUNING BASED ON ADJUSTABLE SEAT POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUDWIG, Chris 3428 Upton Dr. Troy, Michigan 48084 / US | 02 /
CHOI, Jason 630 Laprairie St. Ferndale, MI 48220 / US | 03 /
HAMME, Bradford 22489 Lilac Farmington, MI 48336 / US | [2019/13] |
Former [2019/11] | 01 /
LUDWIG, Chris 3428 Upton Dr. Troy, Michigan 48084 / US | ||
02 /
CHOI, Jason 630 Laprairie ST Ferndale, MI 48220 / US | |||
03 /
HAMME, Bradford 22489 Lilac Farmington, MI 48336 / US | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2019/11] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18189891.7 | 21.08.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | US201715698946 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: US201715698946 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454577 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3454577 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, // B60R16/037 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B60R16/037 (EP,CN,US);
H04R5/023 (KR);
B60R16/02 (CN);
B60R11/0217 (KR);
G06F3/165 (US);
H04R5/04 (KR);
H04S7/302 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60R2011/0017 (KR);
H04R2499/13 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KLANGABSTIMMUNG BASIEREND AUF EINER EINSTELLBAREN SITZPOSITIONIERUNG | [2019/11] | English: | SOUND TUNING BASED ON ADJUSTABLE SEAT POSITIONING | [2019/11] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE SON BASÉ SUR LE POSITIONNEMENT DE SIÈGE RÉGLABLE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2023 | 17.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2007054098 (TAITO CORP) [I] 1,12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2008037803 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * page 15, paragraph 195; figures 5-6, 9, 8C * * page 19, paragraph 230 * * page 59, paragraph 636 - page 61, paragraph 650 *; | [XI]US2014241534 (ZIELINSKI ERIC JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12,17 * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 35; figures 3A-4 * [I] 6,7,9-11,14-16; | [I]US2015350758 (ZHAO XUFANG [CA], et al) [I] 1,12 * page 2, paragraph 19; figures 3, 5A, 6 ** page 5, paragraph 50 - page 6, paragraph 57 * |