EP3446557 - STAND ON MOWER WITH MULTIPLE CUTTING UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bagwan, Rajesaheb John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, c/o Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Henson, Robert John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, c/o Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Evans, Mark D John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, c/o Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Gade, Abhijit John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, c/o Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
Appaian, Thirumal John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, c/o Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Christian John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18189956.8 | 21.08.2018 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | US201715687412 | 25.08.2017 Original published format: US201715687412 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3446557 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3446557 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/44 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A01D34/44 (EP,US);
A01D34/81 (US);
A01D69/02 (US);
B62D11/04 (US);
B62D51/02 (US);
A01D2101/00 (US);
B60K6/46 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAND-ON-MÄHER MIT MEHRFACHEN SCHNEIDEINHEITEN | [2019/09] | English: | STAND ON MOWER WITH MULTIPLE CUTTING UNITS | [2019/09] | French: | TONDEUSE À GAZON À CONDUCTEUR DEBOUT COMPORTANT DE MULTIPLES UNITÉS DE COUPE | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 02.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 03.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1444387 (HOWARD REED MATTHEW) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [YA]JPS4979815 (SATCO MACHINE WORKS) [Y] 7,8,12,13,15 * figure 5 * [A] 9-11,14; | [Y]JPS6422216U (KANZAKI KOSAKAE CO.) [Y] 7-15* page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5947505 (MARTIN JOHN W [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 15; figure 4 * * column 2, line 48 - column 2, line 65 *; | [Y]EP2181580 (DEERE & CO [US]) [Y] 3-5 * [0003], [0013], [0017];; figures 1, 2 *; | [YA]US9485906 (PFLANZER ROSS ALLEN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-15 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 26 * [A] 3-5 |