EP3613545 - SIMULATION ASSISTED PLANNING OF MOTIONS TO LIFT HEAVY OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDANIEL, Richard Gary 2 Pershing Avenue Hightstown, NJ New Jersey 08520 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18190702.3 | 24.08.2018 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613545 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B25J9/1664 (EP,CN,US);
B25J9/1602 (CN);
B25J9/1605 (US);
B25J9/163 (US);
B25J9/1671 (US);
G05B2219/40453 (EP);
G05B2219/40466 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIMULATIONSUNTERSTÜTZTE PLANUNG VON BEWEGUNGEN ZUM ANHEBEN SCHWERER OBJEKTE | [2020/09] | English: | SIMULATION ASSISTED PLANNING OF MOTIONS TO LIFT HEAVY OBJECTS | [2020/09] | French: | PLANIFICATION ASSISTÉE PAR SIMULATION DE MOUVEMENTS POUR LEVER DES OBJETS LOURDS | [2020/09] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 04.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017117546 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* page 3, line 27 - page 14, line 5; figures 1-9 *; | [XYI] - SHITAL S. CHIDDARWAR ET AL, "Optimal trajectory planning for industrial robot along a specified path with payload constraint using trigonometric splines", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF AUTOMATION AND CONTROL, (20120101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1504/IJAAC.2012.045439, ISSN 1740-7516, page 39, XP055560719 [X] 1-3,8-11,15 * page 40, paragraph 2 - page 54, paragraph 2 * [Y] 7,14 [I] 4-6,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1504/IJAAC.2012.045439 | [YA] - BURAK BOYACIOGLU ET AL, "Time-optimal Smoothing of RRT-given Path for Manipulators :", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATICS IN CONTROL, AUTOMATION AND ROBOTICS, (20160101), doi:10.5220/0005984504060411, ISBN 978-989-7581-98-4, pages 406 - 411, XP055560730 [Y] 7,14 * page 407, paragraph 2.1 - page 409, paragraph 2.3 * [A] 1,9,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5220/0005984504060411 | [A] - BEN KEHOE ET AL, "A Survey of Research on Cloud Robotics and Automation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUTOMATION SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, US, (20150401), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TASE.2014.2376492, ISSN 1545-5955, pages 398 - 409, XP055560748 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASE.2014.2376492 |