EP3451295 - DISPLAYING POSITION AND OPTICAL AXIS OF AN ENDOSCOPE IN AN ANATOMICAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOVARI, Assaf c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18191681.8 | 30.08.2018 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | US201715693271 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: US201715693271 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3451295 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/20, G06T7/10 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
G06T11/20 (EP,IL,US);
A61B6/12 (IL,US);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B34/10 (CN);
A61B6/032 (IL,US);
A61B6/461 (IL,US);
A61B6/5211 (IL,US);
A61B90/37 (CN);
G06T7/10 (EP,IL,US);
G06T7/11 (IL,US);
A61B1/233 (CN);
A61B2034/107 (CN);
A61B2034/2051 (CN);
A61B2034/2065 (CN);
A61B2090/364 (CN);
G06T2200/04 (IL,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,IL,US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGE DER POSITION UND OPTISCHEN ACHSE EINES ENDOSKOPS IN EINEM ANATOMISCHEN BILD | [2019/10] | English: | DISPLAYING POSITION AND OPTICAL AXIS OF AN ENDOSCOPE IN AN ANATOMICAL IMAGE | [2019/10] | French: | AFFICHAGE DE LA POSITION ET DE L'AXE OPTIQUE D'UN ENDOSCOPE DANS UNE IMAGE ANATOMIQUE | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010022871 (DE BENI STEFANO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraphs [0080] , [ 0091] - paragraph [0095]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0104] ** paragraph [0118] *; | [IY] - Robert A. Weersink, "Image Fusion and Visualization", Bioengineering for Surgery, Elsevier, (20160101), pages 29 - 58, doi:10.1016/B978-0-08-100123-3.00003-8, ISBN 978-0-08-100123-3, XP055520638 [I] 1-15 * section 3.4.1;; figure 3.7 * * section 3.2.4 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-08-100123-3.00003-8 | by applicant | US5391199 | WO9605768 | US6239724 | US6332089 | US2002065455 | US6484118 | US2003120150 | US6618612 | US6690963 | US2004068178 | US2014344742 | WO2015149041 |