EP3620484 - POLYCARBONATE ARTICLES FOR CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Fen 2550 Xiupu Road, Kangqiao Pudong Kangqiao Pudong, Shanghai 201319 / CN | 02 /
LAI, Hengjie 2550 Xiupu Road Kangqiao Pudong, Shanghai 201319 / CN | 03 /
NIU, Yaming 2550 Xiupu Road Kangqiao Pudong, Shanghai 201319 / CN | 04 /
FANG, Yapeng 2550 Xiupu Road Kangqiao Pudong Shangai 201319 / CN | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18192591.8 | 04.09.2018 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620484 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C09D175/04 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C09D175/16 (EP);
C08L69/00 (CN,US);
B05D7/52 (US);
B05D1/18 (US);
B05D3/067 (US);
C08G18/61 (US);
C08G18/8116 (US);
C08J7/18 (EP);
C08K5/07 (US);
C08K5/5397 (US);
B05D2201/02 (US);
B05D2503/00 (US);
C08J2369/00 (EP,CN);
C08J2475/14 (CN);
C08J2483/07 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATARTIKEL FÜR DIE UNTERHALTUNGSELEKTRONIK | [2020/11] | English: | POLYCARBONATE ARTICLES FOR CONSUMER ELECTRONICS | [2020/11] | French: | ARTICLES DE POLYCARBONATE POUR APPAREILS ÉLECTRONIQUES GRAND PUBLIC | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 05.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2032651 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) [A] 1-15 * All ex. and comp. ex. comprise ITR-PC;; example - * * ...coatings may further be applied to impart...scratch resistance; paragraph [0168] *; | [A]EP3127931 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * siloxane urethane acrylate hard coating on plastic base;; examples 33,34; claims 1,7,11 * * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]KR20170066805 (PACIFIC F&C CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO2018058505 (ALLNEX BELGIUM SA [BE], et al) [A] 1 * siloxane urethane acrylate hard coating on plastic, resin substrate;; claims 1,15,16 * * plastic substrate can be polycarbonate; page 11, line 11 * |