EP3620941 - GENERATING A SPATIAL MODEL OF AN INDOOR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3FROG NV Kanunnik de Deckerstraat 20A 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coudron, Inge Raymond Delahayelaan 13 2500 Lier / BE | 02 /
Hannaert, Jurgen Hulst 34B 1745 Opwijk / BE | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 18192627.0 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620941 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06T7/11, G06T7/143 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06F30/13 (EP);
G06T7/143 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINES RÄUMLICHEN MODELLS EINER INNENRAUMSTRUKTUR | [2020/11] | English: | GENERATING A SPATIAL MODEL OF AN INDOOR STRUCTURE | [2020/11] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'UN MODÈLE SPATIAL D'UNE STRUCTURE INTÉRIEURE | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017316115 (LEWIS JEFFERY D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * | [XI] - NAN LIANGLIANG ET AL, "PolyFit: Polygonal Surface Reconstruction from Point Clouds", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), IEEE, (20171022), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.258, pages 2372 - 2380, XP033283101 [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * * page 2373, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 2374, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 2374, column 2, paragraphs 2-3; figure 2 * * page 2376, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2376, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 4 * * page 2378, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 7 * [I] 2-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.258 | by applicant | US2017263052 | US2017148211 | - L. NAN, "Polygonal surface reconstruction from point clouds", IEEE International Conference on Computer Vision (ICCV), (20170000), doi:doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.258, pages 2372 - 2380, XP033283101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.258 |