EP3453894 - HYDRAULIC SAFETY ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERGANTIS, John 12 Devon Drive Manchester, CT Connecticut 06040 / US | 02 /
VALENTI, Anthony 18 Beacon Hill Blvd Wolcott, CT Connecticut 06716 / US | 03 /
DEPAOLO, Mark P 41 Francis Avenue Middletown, CT Connecticut 06457 / US | 04 /
WEIDLER, Michael J 512 Main Street Cromwell, CT Connecticut 06416 / US | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18192897.9 | 06.09.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | US201715700252 | 11.09.2017 Original published format: US201715700252 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453894 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/20, F16P1/02 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
F16P1/02 (EP,US);
F15B20/00 (US);
F15B15/1438 (US);
F15B15/20 (EP,US);
F16P1/00 (US);
F15B2015/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHER SICHERHEITSADAPTER | [2019/11] | English: | HYDRAULIC SAFETY ADAPTER | [2019/11] | French: | ADAPTATEUR DE SÉCURITÉ HYDRAULIQUE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 12.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1268371 (DOWTY SEALS LTD) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 130 - page 3, line 7 *; | [X]JPS57200702U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]DE19750411 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8* column 4, lines 4-33 * |