EP3570288 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING AT LEAST ONE FEATURE OF INTEREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kärgel, Rainer Langgasse 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | 02 /
Mühlberg, Alexander Nordring 202 90409 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Katzmann, Alexander Lärchenstraße 6 91094 Langensendelbach / DE | 04 /
Sühling, Michael Petra-Kelly-Weg 2 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18193398.7 | 10.09.2018 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | EP20180172664 | 16.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18172664 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570288 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T7/174 (US);
G16H50/20 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US);
G06T2207/30048 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERHALTEN VON MINDESTENS EINEM MERKMAL VON INTERESSE | [2019/47] | English: | METHOD FOR OBTAINING AT LEAST ONE FEATURE OF INTEREST | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'AU MOINS UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'INTÉRÊT | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 25.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016019693 (SILBERSWEIG DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-3,12-17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0131] * * claims 1,15,17 *; | [A] - CHENG RUIDA ET AL, "Automatic MR prostate segmentation by deep learning with holistically-nested networks", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20170224), vol. 10133, doi:10.1117/12.2254558, ISSN 1605-7422, ISBN 978-1-5106-0027-0, pages 101332H - 101332H, XP060086971 [A] 1,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2254558 | by applicant | EP20170196657 |