EP3454193 - CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS OF TERMINAL DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No.18, Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Hong c/o GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18193708.7 | 11.09.2018 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | CN201710812928 | 11.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710812928 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454193 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482, G06F3/0486, G06F21/32, G06K9/00 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06V40/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG EINER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/11] | English: | CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS OF TERMINAL DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET APPAREIL DE DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2021 | 09.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/13] | 19.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 29.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011028186 (LEE JUNGJOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,15 * figure 9A * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * [I] 5-8,13,14; | [A]WO2017003018 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [I]WO2017016066 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [P]EP3319303 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [P] * paragraph [0178]; figures 4,7A-B ** paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0195] * |