EP3624391 - PUBLIC/PRIVATE KEY SYSTEM WITH DECREASED ENCRYPTED MESSAGE SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia-Morchon, Oscar c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bhattacharya, Sauvik c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Tolhuizen, Ludovicus Marinus Gerardus Maria c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18194118.8 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624391 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/30 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H04L9/0841 (EP);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04L9/0822 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (US);
H04L9/3093 (EP);
H04L2209/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖFFENTLICHES/PRIVATES SCHLÜSSELSYSTEM MIT REDUZIERTER VERSCHLÜSSELTER NACHRICHTENGRÖSSE | [2020/12] | English: | PUBLIC/PRIVATE KEY SYSTEM WITH DECREASED ENCRYPTED MESSAGE SIZE | [2020/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLÉ PUBLIQUE/PRIVÉE À TAILLE DE MESSAGE CRYPTÉ RÉDUITE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP3364596 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1-3,5-9,12,13,15-20 * paragraphs [0080] , [0105] - [0108]; figure 3; table 1 * [Y] 10; | [IDY] - SAUVIK BHATTACHARYA ET AL, "Round5: Compact and Fast Post-Quantum Public-Key Encryption", vol. 20180809:142744, (20180806), pages 1 - 37, IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, URL: http://eprint.iacr.org/2018/725.pdf, (20180806), XP061026053 [ID] 1-9,11,12,14-20 * Algorithms 1 to 3, 8, 9, 11 and 12. Sections 3.2 and 3.3;; table 1 * [Y] 10 | [ID] - Hayo Baan ET AL, "Round2: KEM and PKE based on GLWR", International Association for Cryptologic Research, (20171205), URL: https://eprint.iacr.org/2017/1183.pdf, (20180925), XP055509695 [ID] 1-9,11,12,14-20 * algorithms 1, 2, 4, 9, 10, 12, 13. Section 2.4.2;; table 9 * | [IY] - JOPPE BOS ET AL, "Frodo: Take off the ring! Practical, Quantum-Secure Key Exchange from LWE", INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH,, (20170227), vol. 20170227:170204, pages 1 - 26, XP061022682 [I] 1-3,5-9,12,13,15-20 * sections 3.1, 3.2 and 4.4;; figure 1 * [Y] 10 | [T] - "Chapter 12: Key Establishment Protocols ED - Menezes A J; Van Oorschot P C; Vanstone S A", ISBN 978-0-8493-8523-0, (19961001), HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY; [CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS], CRC PRESS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, PAGE(S) 489 - 541, URL: http://www.cacr.math.uwaterloo.ca/hac/, XP001525012 [T] * section 12.3.1 second paragraph below Definition 12.8 * | by applicant | EP20160197277 |