EP3460054 - HISTIDYL-TRNA SYNTHETASE-FC CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states aTyr Pharma, Inc. 3545 John Hopkins Court, Suite 250 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/22] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Atyr Pharma, Inc. 3545 John Hopkins Court, Suite No. 250 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buechler, Ying 1343 Cassins Street Carlsbad, California 92011 / US | 02 /
Chiang, Kyle 162 Mystic Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
Do, Minh-Ha 3911 Zanako Street San Diego, California 92122 / US | 04 /
Lee, Darin 3432 Conrad Avenue San Diego, California 92117 / US | 05 /
Piehl, Kristi 5321 Zion Avenue San Diego, California 92130 / US | 06 /
Thomas, Marc 800 Orca Avo Drive Vista, California 92084-0282 / US | 07 /
Watkins, Jeffry D. 3442 Fortuna Ranch Road Encinitas, California 92024 / US | 08 /
Wu, Chi-Fang 2649 Villas Way San Diego, California 92108 / US | 09 /
Mendlein, John D. 1550 Neptune Avenue Encinitas, California 92024 / US | [2019/24] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
Buechler, Ying 1343 Cassins Street Carlsbad, California 92011 / US | ||
02 /
Chiang, Kyle 1615 Debann Road Cardiff, California 92011 / US | |||
03 /
Do, Minh-Ha 3911 Zanako Street San Diego, California 92122 / US | |||
04 /
Lee, Darin 3432 Conrad Avenue San Diego, California 92117 / US | |||
05 /
Piehl, Kristi 5321 Zion Avenue San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
06 /
Thomas, Marc 800 Orca Avo Drive Vista, California 92084-0282 / US | |||
07 /
Watkins, Jeffry D. 3442 Fortuna Ranch Road Encinitas, California 92024 / US | |||
08 /
Wu, Chi-Fang 2649 Villas Way San Diego, California 92108 / US | |||
09 /
Mendlein, John D. 1550 Neptune Avenue Encinitas, California 92024 / US | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18194251.7 | 14.03.2014 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | US201361789011P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789011 P | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460054 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3460054 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00, C12N9/96, A61P21/00, A61P29/00, A61P11/00, A61P37/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,US);
C12Y601/01021 (US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 17.09.2019 | ME | 17.09.2019 | Title | German: | HISTIDYL-TRNA-SYNTHETASE-FC-KONJUGATE | [2019/13] | English: | HISTIDYL-TRNA SYNTHETASE-FC CONJUGATES | [2019/13] | French: | CONJUGUÉS HISTIDYL-ARNT SYNTHÉTASE-RÉGION FC | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 17.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14727652.1 / EP2970921 | Divisional application(s) | EP20202708.2 Application withdrawn : 02.02.2021 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | IE | 14.03.2021 | LU | 14.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010107825 (PANGU BIOPHARMA LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-14 * pages 1-9,32,; claim - * * the whole document *; | [A]US2011086058 (JIANG SHIBO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011072265 (ATYR PHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * pages 4,37-38; claim -; sequence 28 * * pages 64-65 *; | [IP]WO2013123432 (ATYR PHARMA INC [US], et al) [IP] 1-14 * the whole document * * pages 87,97; claim - * * page 115 *; | [YDP]US2014066321 (XU ZHIWEN [CN], et al) [YDP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - PAUL J CARTER, "Introduction to current and future protein therapeutics: A protein engineering perspective", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 317, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.YEXCR.2011.02.013, ISSN 0014-4827, (20110224), pages 1261 - 1269, (20110301), XP028205664 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2011.02.013 | [A] - HUANG ET AL, "Receptor-Fc fusion therapeutics, traps, and MIMETIBODY technology", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.COPBIO.2009.10.010, ISSN 0958-1669, (20091104), pages 692 - 699, (20091104), XP026778880 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2009.10.010 | [A] - A. HÄUSSERMANN ET AL, "Das Anti-Jo-1-Syndrom - eine Sonderform der Myositis mit interstitieller Lungenerkrankung", PNEUMOLOGIE, (20100412), vol. 64, no. 08, doi:10.1055/s-0029-1244054, ISSN 0934-8387, pages 496 - 503, XP055131699 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0029-1244054 | [A] - LEVINE STUART M ET AL, "Anti-aminoacyl tRNA synthetase immune responses: Insights into the pathogenesis of the idiopathic inflammatory myopathies", CURRENT OPINION IN RHEUMATOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (20031101), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 1040-8711, pages 708 - 713, XP009145406 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - GUZZO ET AL, "Systematic analysis of fusion and affinity tags using human aspartyl-tRNA synthetase expressed in E. coli", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (20070426), vol. 54, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PEP.2007.03.001, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 166 - 175, XP022056649 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2007.03.001 | [A] - KATSUMATA ET AL, "Species-specific immune responses generated by histidyl-tRNA synthetase immunization are associated with muscle and lung inflammation", JOURNAL OF AUTOIMMUNITY, LONDON, GB, (20070912), vol. 29, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.JAUT.2007.07.005, ISSN 0896-8411, pages 174 - 186, XP022245362 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaut.2007.07.005 | [A] - FRIEDMAN A W ET AL, "Interstitial lung disease with autoantibodies againstaminoacyl-tRNA synthetases in the absence of clinically apparent myositis", SEMINARS IN ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMAT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960801), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0049-0172(96)80026-6, ISSN 0049-0172, pages 459 - 467, XP004680757 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-0172(96)80026-6 | [T] - MERTSCHING E C ET AL, "Identification of a T cell immunomodulatory domain in histidyl-tRNA synthetase", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180501), Database accession no. EMB-623263267, XP002787016 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * | [P] - MERTSCHING E C ET AL, "Identification of a T cell immunomodulatory domain in histidyl-tRNA synthetase", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY 20180501 AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS NLD, (20180501), vol. 200, no. 1, Supplement 1, ISSN 1550-6606 | [T] - Elisabeth Mertsching ET AL, "Identification of a T cell immunomodulatory domain in histidyl-tRNA synthetase", Poster Presentation: Identification of a T Cell Immunomodulatory Domain In Histidyl-Trna Synthetase, New York, (20180502), URL: https://investors.atyrpharma.com/static-files/90075be1-9e21-45f0-a7a4-be03f788c635, (20181203), XP055529376 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | - K. Ogilvie ET AL, "ATYR1923 iMod domain of HARS: ATYR1923 Ameliorates Dermal and Pulmonary Fibrosis in a Murine Model of Sclerodermatous Chronic Graft vs. Host Disease Introduction", Poster presented at the Scleroderma Foundation National Patient Education Conference July 27-29, 2018; Philadelphia, PA, (20180727), URL: https://investors.atyrpharma.com/static-files/9ba7f4dd-2956-4a45-ba6b-bbc866cdb690, (20191129), XP055647750 | - Suzanne Paz ET AL, "ATYR1923 Reduces Neutrophil Infiltration in an Acute Lipopolysaccharide (LPS) Lung Injury Model", Keystone Symposia 2019 Conference in Santa Fe, New Mexico from February 24-28, 2019., (20190227), URL: https://www.atyrpharma.com/wp-content/uploads/2019/02/ATYR1923-Reduces-Neutrophil-Infiltration-in-an-Acute-Lipopolysaccharide-LPS-Lung-Injury-Model.pdf, (20191129), XP055647768 | by applicant | US3773919 | US4326053 | US4326052 | US4751180 | US4861760 | US4873192 | US4888354 | US4935233 | US5116964 | US5420109 | US5428130 | US5455165 | US5466468 | US5514582 | US5624821 | US5725871 | US5756353 | US5780045 | US5804212 | WO0042072 | US6291212 | US6300099 | US6406697 | US2003190311 | WO2004016750 | WO2005047337 | US2005255144 | US7029872 | US7030226 | US2006173170 | US2006269553 | US2007092940 | US2007092521 | US7217797 | US7230068 | US2007148170 | US2007224188 | US2007253966 | US2007269369 | US7326681 | US2008206246 | US7425619 | WO2008147143 | US2009010921 | US2009017023 | US2009163699 | US7629163 | US7632924 | US7638299 | US7662925 | US2010080794 | US2010092997 | US7700321 | US7732570 | US2010143254 | US7737226 | US7736872 | US2010184959 | US2010203046 | US2010209424 | US2010249382 | US2010255013 | US7816320 | US7820766 | US7829310 | US7838265 | US7883866 | US7939496 | US7947473 | US2011183412 | - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, vol. I & II | - Peptide and protein PEGylation, Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20020000), vol. 54, pages 453 - 609 | - ZALIPSKY, S. et al., "Use of functionalized Poly(Ethylene Glycols) for modification of polypeptides", Polyethylene Glycol Chemistry: Biotechnical and Biomedical Applications | - DEVERAUX et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, page 3389 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453 | - E. MEYERS; W. MILLER, Cabios, (19890000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - KUNKEL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19850000), vol. 82, pages 488 - 492 | - KUNKEL et al., Methods in Enzymol, (19870000), vol. 154, pages 367 - 382 | - "A model of evolutionary change in proteins). Matrices for determining distance relationships", DAYHOFF et al., Atlas of protein sequence and structure, National Biomedical Research Foundation, (19780000), vol. 5, pages 345 - 358 | - GONNET et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 256, pages 14430 - 1445 | - XU et al., Structure, (20120000), vol. 20, pages 1470 - 7 | - ZAIWARA et al., Mol Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 51, pages 67 - 102 | - PERONA; HADD, Biochemistry, (20120000), vol. 51, pages 8705 - 29 | - MORIN et al., Trends Biotechol., (20110000), vol. 29, pages 159 - 66 | - COLLINS et al., Annu. Rev. Biophys., (20110000), vol. 40, pages 81 - 98 | - WITTMANN et al., J Vis Exp., (20120000), vol. 65, page e4203 | - FELDMAN et al., Mol Cell, (20120000), vol. 47, pages 585 - 95 | - CLUTTERBUCK et al., J Proteomics, (20110000), vol. 74, pages 704 - 15 | - GIDDINGS; MAITRA, J Biomol Screen, (20100000), vol. 15, pages 1204 - 10 | - WIJNHOVEN et al., Glycoconj J., (20080000), vol. 25, pages 177 - 85 | - FROW et al., Med Res Rev., (20040000), vol. 24, pages 276 - 98 | - ROBERTS; VELLACCIO, The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, Academic Press, Inc., (19830000), vol. 5, page 341 | - Combinatorial Chemistry, John Wiley & Sons Inc., (19970000), page 235 | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, John Wiley & Sons Inc., (19950000), pages 619 - 620 | - NAKAMURA et al., Nuc. Acid. Res., (20000000), vol. 28, page 292 | - KAMEDA et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20060000), vol. 349, pages 1269 - 1277 | - ZUKER M., Nucl. Acid Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 3406 - 3415 | - MANTYH et al., PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 2662 - 2666 | - MANTYH et al., Prot. Exp. & Purif., (19950000), vol. 6, page 124 | - MERRIFIELD, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19630000), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154 | - BEAUCAGE et al., Tetrahedron Letters, (19810000), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1869 | - MATTHES et al., EMBO Journal, (19840000), vol. 3, pages 801 - 805 | - "Structural Genomics Consortium", Nature Methods, (20080000), vol. 5, pages 135 - 146 | - SHIMP et al., Protein Expr Purif., (20060000), vol. 50, pages 58 - 67 | - QING et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 877 - 882 | - GRANT et al., Methods Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544 | - LI et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20060000), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - HAMILTON et al., Science, (20030000), vol. 301, page 1244 | - HAMILTON et al., Science, (20060000), vol. 313, pages 1441 - 1443 | - WILDT et al., Nature Reviews Microbiol., (20050000), vol. 3, pages 119 - 28 | - GERNGROSS et al., Nature-Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - TAKAMATSU, EMBO J., (19870000), vol. 6, pages 307 - 311 | - CORUZZI et al., EMBO J., (19840000), vol. 3, pages 1671 - 1680 | - BROGLIE et al., Science, (19840000), vol. 224, pages 838 - 843 | - WINTER et al., Results Probl. Cell Differ., (19910000), vol. 17, pages 85 - 105 | - HOBBS, Yearbook of Science and Technology, McGraw Hill, (19920000), pages 191 - 196 | - ENGELHARD et al., PNAS USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 3224 - 3227 | - LOGAN; SHENK, PNAS USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 3655 - 3659 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Virol., (19770000), vol. 36, page 59 | - MATHER, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER et al., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19820000), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB et al., PNAS USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216 | - YAZAKI; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (20030000), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - SHIN et al., Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 10, pages 177 - 186 | - UMANA et al., Nat Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180 | - DAVIES et al., Biotechnol Bioeng., (20010000), vol. 74, pages 288 - 294 | - SHIELDS et al., J Biol Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740 | - SHINKAWA et al., J Biol Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 3466 - 3473 | - SHIELDS et al., J Biol Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604 | - PRESTA et al., Biochem Soc Trans., (20020000), vol. 30, pages 487 - 490 | - ZUCKERMAN et al., CRC Crit Rev Microbiol., (19780000), vol. 7, pages 1 - 26 | - CLYNES et al., PNAS, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - GEORGE; HERINGA, J Protein Eng., (20020000), vol. 15, pages 871 - 879 | - MARATEA et al., Gene, (19850000), vol. 40, pages 39 - 46 | - MURPHY et al., PNAS USA, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 8258 - 8262 | - LIU et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 5525 - 5530 | - KIM et al., PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 1156 - 1160 | - CHAUDHARY et al., PNAS, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 1066 - 1070 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - DESJARLAIS; BERG, PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 2256 - 2260 | - PNAS, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 11099 - 11103 | - DONNELLY et al., J. Gen. Virol., (20010000), vol. 82, pages 1027 - 1041 | - DONNELLY et al., Journal of General Virology, (20010000), vol. 82, pages 1027 - 1041 | - RYAN et al., J. Gener. Virol., (19970000), vol. 78, pages 699 - 722 | - SCYMCZAK et al., Nature Biotech., (20040000), vol. 5, pages 589 - 594 | - MILLER, LM, Pathology Lecture Notes, Atlantic Veterinary College | - PUFFENBERGER et al., PLoS ONE, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 1, page e28936 | - PIERCE et al., PNAS USA, (20110000), vol. 108, no. 16, pages 6543 - 6548 | - HOFFMAN AS, Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (20010000), vol. 944, pages 62 - 73 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, pages 1035 - 1038,1570-1580 | - FINNIN; MORGAN, J. Pharm. Sci., (19990000), vol. 88, no. 10, pages 955 - 958 | - FICHTNER-FEIGL et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20050000), vol. 115, pages 3057 - 3071 | US20070859203 | US20080128107 |