EP3460283 - ISOLATOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAID ISOLATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italgum S.r.l. Via Vegri, 27 36063 Zane' (Vicenza) / IT | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNARETTO, Vittorio Italgum S.r.l. c/o Italgum S.r.l. Via Vegri, 27 36063 Zane' (Vicenza) / IT | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Feltrinelli, Secondo Andrea APTA S.r.l. Patent Department Via Ca' di Cozzi, 41 37124 Verona / IT | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18194600.5 | 14.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | IT20170107082 | 25.09.2017 Original published format: IT201700107082 | [2019/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460283 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/40, E04B1/62, E04H9/02 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
F16F1/40 (EP);
E04H9/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER DÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/13] | English: | ISOLATOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAID ISOLATOR DEVICE | [2019/13] | French: | ISOLATEUR ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION DUDIT ISOLATEUR | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4899323 (FUKAHORI YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 30, 33 * * column 1, line 13 - line 20 * * column 12, line 14 - line 26 * * column 12, line 37 - line 42 * [A] 1-8,10-17; | [XAYI]JPH09256509 (KUME SEKKEI KK, et al) [X] 1,8,11 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0008] , [ 0010] , [ 0015] * [A] 3-5,10,12-17 [Y] 9[I] 2,6,7; | [A]JP2000283225 (KAWAGUCHI METAL IND CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0012] , [ 0013] *; | [A]JP2001287315 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0006] , [ 0007] , [ 0011] , [ 0045] *; | [A]EP1801322 (STAHLTON BAUTEILE AG [CH]) [A] 1-17 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0008] *; | [A]JP2014001322 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] * |