EP3624281 - INTEGRATED MODULAR SYSTEM FOR WITHDRAWABLE SWITCHGEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microelettrica Scientifica S.p.A. Viale Lucania 2 20090 Buccinasco (Milano) / IT | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBERI, Massimo Via Pompeo Cambiasi 14/4 20131 Milano / IT | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18194797.9 | 17.09.2018 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624281 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/02 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H02B11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES MODULARES SYSTEM FÜR HERAUSNEHMBARE SCHALTANLAGE | [2020/12] | English: | INTEGRATED MODULAR SYSTEM FOR WITHDRAWABLE SWITCHGEAR | [2020/12] | French: | SYSTÈME INTÉGRÉ MODULAIRE POUR APPAREILLAGE DE COMMUTATION AMOVIBLE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0054265 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * pages 9,10; figure - *; | [XI]JPH07336818 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-8,10 * figures 1,2,5 * [I] 9; | [I]EP0762819 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-10* column 1, lines 3-27; figure - *; | [X]US2014002961 (KOBAYASHI HIROTSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * figure - * |