EP3457164 - METHOD FOR LOCATING A TAG, IN PARTICULAR OF AN OBJECT AND/OR A PERSON WITHIN A THREE-DIMENSIONAL SPATIAL AREA AND LOCATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hochschule Osnabrück Albrechtstrasse 30 49076 Osnabrück / DE | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belchhaus, Chris Pastor-Goudefroy-Str. 27 49090 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Schaarschmidt, Marco Natruper Str. 205 49076 Osnabrück / DE | 03 /
Westerkamp, Clemens Schreberstraße 28 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Träger, Denis Dr. Träger & Strautmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Stüvestrasse 2 49076 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Träger, Denis, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rolandsmauer 15 49074 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 18194898.5 | 17.09.2018 | [2019/12] | Priority number, date | DE201710121582 | 18.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017121582 | [2019/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457164 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G01S5/0289 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] |
Former [2019/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG EINES TAGS, INSBESONDERE EINES OBJEKTS, UND/ODER EINER PERSON INNERHALB EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN RAUMBEREICHS UND ORTUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/12] | English: | METHOD FOR LOCATING A TAG, IN PARTICULAR OF AN OBJECT AND/OR A PERSON WITHIN A THREE-DIMENSIONAL SPATIAL AREA AND LOCATION SYSTEM | [2019/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION D'UNE BALISE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN OBJET, ET / OU D'UNE PERSONNE À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UNE ZONE SPATIAL TRIDIMENSIONNELLE ET UN SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION | [2019/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 20.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/24] | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017261592 (MIN GUOHUA [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0088] * [I] 8; | [XI]US2016259032 (HEHN MARKUS [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0042] , [ 122] , [ 134] * * paragraph [0222] - paragraph [0233] * * abstract * [I] 15; | [A]EP1617601 (UNIV TWENTE [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0249379 (PULSE LINK INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |