EP3626994 - BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOKREHEL, Csaba Etele 65, 2/19 1119 Budapest / HU | 02 /
NEMETH, Huba Gyékényes u. 57. 1116 Budapest / HU | 03 /
BUCH, Andreas Im Mitterfeld 49 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 04 /
SIPOS, András Neideckstr. 13 81249 Munich / DE | 05 /
TIHANYI, Dr. Viktor Kiscelli utca 6. 1032 Budapest / HU | 06 /
SZABO, Janos Virág u. 29. 1/18 1042 Budapest / HU | 07 /
MLINARCSEK, Csaba Irinyi János Str. 12 1165 Budapest / HU | 08 /
PAHLE, Wolfgang Freihausstrasse 9 83707 Bad Wiessee / DE | 09 /
TRIMPE, Robert Gänzerberg 15 82234 Weßling / DE | 10 /
BLESSING, Michael Agnes-Bernauer-Str. 182 80687 Munich / DE | 11 /
KLINGNER, Matthias Jahnstr. 10a 82272 Moorenweis / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Hartig, Michael Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Schmid, Nils T.F. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18195255.7 | 18.09.2018 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626994 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/18, F16D59/02, F16D63/00 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
F16D65/18 (EP,KR,US);
F16D59/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16D63/006 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2055/0091 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2121/06 (US);
F16D2121/20 (EP);
F16D2121/22 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2125/64 (US);
F16D2127/06 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2129/065 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSENBAUGRUPPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BREMSENBAUGRUPPE | [2020/13] | English: | BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKE ASSEMBLY | [2020/13] | French: | ENSEMBLE FREIN ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'ENSEMBLE FREIN | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 03.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2156020 (REPCO RES PTY LTD) [X] 1-3,13-15* page 2, line 109 - page 5, line 27 *; | [XA]US6471017 (BOOZ OTHMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,13-15 * column 2, line 55 - column 7, line 5; figure - * [A] 2-8,10-12; | [X]US2017108067 (MASUDA YUI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,12-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0033]; figure - * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0081] *; | [XA]EP3299660 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,12-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0051]; figure - * [A] 7,9-11 |