EP3460615 - SPHERICAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Kento c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI, Seiya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18195379.5 | 19.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | JP20170182234 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017182234 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460615 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G05D1/08, G05D1/00, B25J9/00, B62D57/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G05D1/0088 (EP,US);
B25J11/00 (CN);
G05D1/0246 (US);
B25J19/00 (CN);
B25J19/002 (CN);
G05D1/0238 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUGELROBOTER | [2019/13] | English: | SPHERICAL ROBOT | [2019/13] | French: | ROBOT SPHÉRIQUE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006049559 (KAZNOV VIKTOR [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * pages 3,5,13; figures 4c,13,16; claims 1,13,22 * * pages 15,17 *; | [A]CN103171638 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0021] , [0023] - [0026] - [0028]; figures 1-3; claims 1,3,7 *; | [A]WO2016068262 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0012] , [0016] , [0026] - [0027]; figures 1-4; claims 1,8-9,13-15 *; | [A]US2017153638 (KAWAMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0081] , [0019] , [0021] , [0029]; figures 1,3,4; claims 1-2,8 * | by applicant | JP2014021625 | JP2017102538 |