EP3486941 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome, Koutou-ku 135-0061 Tokyo / JP | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Masao c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation, 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome, Koutou-ku Tokyo, 135-0061 / JP | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 18196129.3 | 23.09.2018 | [2019/21] | Priority number, date | JP20170220209 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017220209 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486941 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L29/423, H01L29/66, H01L29/792 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H01L29/792 (EP,US);
H01L21/0214 (US);
H01L21/02145 (US);
H01L21/02148 (US);
H01L21/02164 (US);
H01L21/02178 (US);
H01L21/02181 (US);
H01L21/022 (US);
H01L21/02356 (US);
H01L29/40117 (EP,US);
H01L29/4234 (EP,US);
H01L29/42364 (US);
H01L29/513 (US);
H01L29/517 (US);
H01L29/518 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/21] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2019/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006220106 (CHOI HAN-MEI [KR], et al); | [X]US2009078990 (YASUDA NAOKI [JP]); | [X]US2009239367 (KIM BYONG-JU [KR], et al); | [A]EP2846348 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]); | [A]EP2950332 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2015053474 |