EP3468221 - HEADPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rion Co., Ltd. 20-41, Higashimoto-machi 3-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Shinichi RION Co., Ltd. 20-41, Higashimotomachi 3-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Takashi RION Co., Ltd. 20-41, Higashimotomachi 3-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
NAGAMINE, Kenichi ASHIDA SOUND CO., LTD. 3-4-9 Osaki Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
MANO, Takashi ASHIDA SOUND CO., LTD. 3-4-9 Osaki Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 18196137.6 | 24.09.2018 | [2019/15] | Priority number, date | JP20170194509 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017194509 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468221 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R1/28 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H04R1/1008 (EP,US);
H04R1/1058 (CN,US);
H04R1/1083 (US);
H04R1/2803 (EP,US);
H04R2201/105 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPFHÖRER | [2019/15] | English: | HEADPHONE | [2019/15] | French: | CASQUE | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 15.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3112005 (SHAW EDGAR A G, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2006249 (AKG) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH105197 (RION CO) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US2003007660 (TSUNODA NAOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013343565 (RIDLER BETTINA [DK]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X] - Amazon, "AKG K518 LE Kopfhörer rot: Amazon.de: Elektronik", (20091009), URL: https://www.amazon.de/AKG-K518-LE-Kopfhörer-rot/dp/B002F9MFTI, (20190130), XP055549142 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | [X] - Amazon, "LEORX Ein paar von PU Schaum Kopfhörer Ohrpolster Ohrpolster für AKG K518 K518DJ K518LE K81 SONY MDR-NC6: Amazon.de: Baumarkt", (20150916), URL: https://www.amazon.de/dp/B015FHFH00/ref=psdc_1382720031_t1_B07D5GS1LZ, (20190130), XP055549189 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2011160310 | JP2016015691 |