EP3628861 - NOISE CONTROL OF WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egedal, Per St. Lundgard vej 65 7400 Herning / DK | 02 /
Hansen, Tomas Rosenberg Over Vrøndingvej 2 8700 Horsens / DK | 03 /
Oerlemans, Stefan Thrigesvej 27, 3.3 7400 Herning / DK | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 18196477.6 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628861 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/04, F03D7/02 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
F03D7/048 (EP,US);
F03D7/0296 (EP,US);
F03D7/0276 (US);
F03D7/042 (US);
F05B2260/96 (EP);
F05B2260/966 (EP,US);
F05B2270/101 (US);
F05B2270/327 (US);
F05B2270/328 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄUSCHREGELUNG EINER WINDTURBINE | [2020/14] | English: | NOISE CONTROL OF WIND TURBINE | [2020/14] | French: | CONTRÔLE DE BRUIT D'ÉOLIENNE | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010037387 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]US2010133818 (KINZIE KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]US2011223006 (LOH FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0048] * * figure 5 *; | [X]WO2017198270 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 5 - page 17, line 29 * * figure - *; | [X]WO2017198271 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 26 - page 17, line 13 * * figure - * |