EP3493260 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY DEVICES AND METHODS OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Euntaek 411-1302, 206, Baekhyeon-ro Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SHIN, JoongShik 105-1405, SK Apt., Seocheon-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 18196741.5 | 26.09.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | KR20170155163 | 20.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170155163 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493260 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/11575 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H10B43/50 (EP,US);
H10B41/27 (KR,US);
H10B41/10 (US);
H10B41/35 (KR,US);
H10B41/40 (US);
H10B41/41 (KR);
H10B43/10 (US);
H10B43/27 (US);
H10B43/35 (US);
H10B43/40 (US);
H01L29/1037 (US);
H01L29/4236 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE HALBLEITERSPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/23] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY DEVICES AND METHODS OF FABRICATING THE SAME | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE MÉMOIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS TRIDIMENSIONNELS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 04.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015236038 (PACHAMUTHU JAYAVEL [US], et al); | [A]US9576967 (KIMURA HAJIME [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2017034646 (SANDISK TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) |