EP3629173 - EVENT LOG PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIE, Hongchao c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 18197044.3 | 27.09.2018 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629173 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, G06F11/34, G06N20/00 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G06F11/3476 (EP,US);
G06F11/07 (US);
G06F11/3013 (US);
G06F11/3452 (US);
G06F17/40 (EP);
G06F9/542 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EREIGNISPROTOKOLLVERARBEITUNG | [2020/14] | English: | EVENT LOG PROCESSING | [2020/14] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE JOURNAL D'ÉVÉNEMENT | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014115002 (KOCHER MICHAEL [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0197]-[0204] *; | [IAY]US2014297317 (HU JIANYING [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6-12,15 * paragraph [0006], [0007] * [A] 3 [Y] 4,5,13,14; | [A]WO2016053580 (BENEFITFOCUS COM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] *; | [IAY]US2018113780 (KIM YOONGU [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6-12,15 * figures 1B, 2A, 2B, 3,4 * * paragraph [0007], [0057] * * paragraph [0103] * [A] 3 [Y] 4,5,13,14; | [YA] - HEBA ALY ET AL, "Dejavu: An Accurate Energy-efficient Outdoor Localization System", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 21ST ACM SIGSPATIAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES IN GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SYSTEMS, SIGSPATIAL'13, New York, New York, USA, (20130101), doi:10.1145/2525314.2525338, ISBN 978-1-4503-2521-9, pages 154 - 163, XP055252300 [Y] 4,5,13,14 * page 155, Figure 1 * * page 159, 1st, 2nd paragraph * [A] 1-3,6-12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2525314.2525338 |